This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2022 at 08:14:49 (UTC).

Allen v. Great West Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Great West Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02724

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirk Allen

Defendants

Great West Casualty Company

Grammer Industries, Inc.

Grammer Logistics, Inc.

Glenn Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph A. Fried

Attorney at Fried Goldberg LLC

Three Alliance Center, 3550 Lenox Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Briant G. Mildenhall

Attorney at Fried Goldberg LLC

3550 Lenox Road, N.E., Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Peter Stone

Attorney at Stone Kalfus LLP

One Midtown Plaza, 1360 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Shawn N. Kalfus

Attorney at Stone Kalfus LLP

One Midtown Plaza, 1360 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt

Attorney at Stone Kalfus LLP

One Midtown Plaza, 1360 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott.(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#20

(#20) AFFIDAVIT of Service Glenn Scott. (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott.(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#18

(#18) Initial Disclosures by Kirk Allen.(Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #15 Initial Disclosures by Kirk Allen. (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Kirk Allen re #15 Initial Disclosures (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#15

(#15) Initial Disclosures by Kirk Allen.(Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#14

(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Kirk Allen. Kirk Allen served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#12

(#13) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #12 Acknowledgment of Service (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 12-14, November 23-30, December 26-30, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ORI Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Republic International Corporation for Great West Casualty Company; Other Affiliate Grammer Transport, Inc., Other Affiliate Grammer Investment Holdings, LLC for Grammer Logistics, Inc. by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott.(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott. (Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott. Discovery ends on 12/9/2022.(Kalfus, Shawn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/12/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit All pleadings filed in state court

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott.(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #17 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #15 Initial Disclosures , to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT of Service Glenn Scott. (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott.(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Initial Disclosures by Kirk Allen.(Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #15 Initial Disclosures by Kirk Allen. (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Kirk Allen re #15 Initial Disclosures (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Disclosures by Kirk Allen.(Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Kirk Allen. Kirk Allen served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #12 Acknowledgment of Service (Mildenhall, Briant) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an 8-month discovery period. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/27/22. (jpa) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #7 Order, (Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott. (Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in cases Proceeding before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Parties are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/25/22. (jpa) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 12-14, November 23-30, December 26-30, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ORI Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Republic International Corporation for Great West Casualty Company; Other Affiliate Grammer Transport, Inc., Other Affiliate Grammer Investment Holdings, LLC for Grammer Logistics, Inc. by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott.(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott. (Kalfus, Shawn) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Grammer Industries, Inc., Grammer Logistics, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott. Discovery ends on 12/9/2022.(Kalfus, Shawn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Grammer Industries, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Glenn Scott, Grammer Logistics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11918335) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All pleadings filed in state court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grammer Industries Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheetal M. Brahmbhatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Peter Stone