This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 08:20:07 (UTC).

Allen v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Allen filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02111

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aidan J Allen

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Incorporated

Trans Union LLC

American Express Company

American Express National Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinette G Kent

Attorney at Kent Law Offices

3219 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 588

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorneys

Emily Gildar Wagner

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

James Paul Acosta

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC - Plano, TX

6900 Dallas Pkwy., Ste. 800

Plano, TX 75024

Peter Ryan Montecuollo

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP - Kansas City, MO

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Acosta, James) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate New Horizons Fund for Trans Union LLC. (Acosta, James) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER denying the #19 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that Defendant Trans Union LLC shall file a disclosure statement no later than February 9, 2022. Continued failure to abide by the Federal Rules will result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/4/2022. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

17 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#6

(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aidan J Allen: Affidavit of Service re: Affidavit of Service upon Trans Union LLC on 12/14/2021. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/14/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to American Express Company, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20147291. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-02111-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Aidan J Allen. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Wagner, Emily) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Acosta, James) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Other Affiliate New Horizons Fund for Trans Union LLC. (Acosta, James) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER denying the #19 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that Defendant Trans Union LLC shall file a disclosure statement no later than February 9, 2022. Continued failure to abide by the Federal Rules will result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/4/2022. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Trans Union to Answer by Aidan J Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation for Extension to Answer or Respond to Complaint (Second Request) (Doc. #17 ), in which they stipulate to an extension of twenty-nine (29) days for Defendant American Express National Bank (designated in the Complaint as "American Express Company") ("American Express") to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Having considered this second request, IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED. American Express shall have until March 4, 2022, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/25/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (Second Request) by American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montecuollo, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation for 30-Day Extension to Answer or Respond to Complaint (First Request) (Doc. #15 ), in which they stipulate to an extension for Defendant American Express National Bank (designated in the Complaint as "American Express Company") ("American Express") to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. For good cause showing, IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. #15 ) is GRANTED. American Express shall have until February 3, 2022, to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/5/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (First Request) by American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montecuollo, Peter) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Wagner, Emily) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Wagner, Emily) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for TransUnion by Aidan J Allen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/7/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/16/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aidan J Allen: Affidavit of Service re: Affidavit of Service upon American Express Company on 12/14/2021. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aidan J Allen: Affidavit of Service re: Affidavit of Service upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 12/14/2021. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aidan J Allen: Affidavit of Service re: Affidavit of Service upon Trans Union LLC on 12/14/2021. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/14/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to American Express Company, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20147291. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-02111-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Aidan J Allen. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20147291 filed by Aidan J Allen. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Ryan Montecuollo