This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 10:02:45 (UTC).

Allen v. Dr Summer Eldridge et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Allen filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dr Summer Eldridge. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bob Whitely

Jennette Lindor

Lt Vernon

Tim Ross

Justin Barnes

Donna Clems

Walter Campbell

Brad Allison

Luke Kormylo

sadie lewiston

Doug Starr

Marc Ultiss

Randall Valley

Kim Hutchinson

Beth Ford

Will Rogers

Terry Legg

Joshua Overgarrd

Jules Seyville

Idaho Department of Correction

35 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)

#5

(#5) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Zachary T. Allen. (lm)

#3

(#3) Supplement by Plaintiff Zachary T. Allen. Responses due by 4/9/2021 (lm) Modified on 3/19/2021 (lm). (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/23/2021 to redact personal identifiers) (kt).

#2

No Description Available

#1

(#1) Prisoner Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Zachary T. Allen. Responses due by 4/9/2021 (lm)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Zachary T. Allen. (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplement by Plaintiff Zachary T. Allen. Responses due by 4/9/2021 (lm) Modified on 3/19/2021 (lm). (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/23/2021 to redact personal identifiers) (kt).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Successors in Office, Brad Allison, Elizabeth Atkinson, Justin Barnes, Tonya Barnes, Kenneth Brown, Walter Campbell, Donna Clems, Corizon Correctional Health, Rachel Daughtry, Bree Derrick, James Detoit, Mike Dominguez, Dr Summer Eldridge, Dr.Kenneth Ellison, Beth Ford, Adrian Fry, Governor, Kate Holmes, Emily Hutchinson, Kim Hutchinson, Idaho Department of Correction, Idaho State Correctional Institute, Kate Karlson, Luke Kormylo, Breona Kraft, Dustin LaRochelle, Terry Legg, Jennette Lindor, Lt Vernon, Nichole Menear, Joshua Overgarrd, Chad Page, Al Ramirez, Crystal Robbles, Jacob Rodgers, Danny Roe, Will Rogers, Russel Ross, Tim Ross, Corey Seely, Jules Seyville, Doug Starr, State Board of Corrections, Shilo Stephens, Krina Stewart, Marc Ultiss, Randall Valley, Laura Watson, Bob Whitely, michael hoffman, sadie lewiston, danel madrid, kim reyes, filed by Zachary T. Allen.(lm) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/23/2021) (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Errata B) (kt).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Zachary T. Allen. Responses due by 4/9/2021 (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Idaho Department of Corrections is a litigant