This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 10:38:47 (UTC).

Allen v. Columbia Mall, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Columbia Mall, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04064

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jo Ann Allen

Defendants

Dillard's Inc.

Columbia Mall, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael S. Holder

Attorney at Holder Susan Slusher, LLC

107 N. Seventh Street

Columbia, MO 65201

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Todd Cook

Attorney at McAnany, Van Cleave & Phillips, PC.-StL

505 North 7Th Street, Suite 2100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Memo on PTC

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

3 #1

Pleadings from State Court Action

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Lou Leonatti(Holder, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Lou Leonatti(Holder, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Gregory Todd Cook on behalf of Defendants Columbia Mall, LLC, Dillard's Inc.. (Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jo Ann Allen of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendants filed by Michael S. Holder on behalf of Plaintiff Jo Ann Allen.(Holder, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 04/16/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2022 09:00 AM Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2021. Signed on 04/16/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Jo Ann Allen. (Holder, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Gregory Todd Cook on behalf of Defendant Dillard's Inc..(Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Columbia Mall, LLC, Dillard's Inc..(Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/20/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 4/13/2021. Signed on 03/30/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 03/30/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of filing Defendants' Submission of Pleadings from State Court Action by Columbia Mall, LLC, Dillard's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Pleadings from State Court Action)(Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Columbia Mall, LLC, Dillard's Inc. (Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Boone County Circuit Court County, case number 21BA-CV00462, filed by Gregory Todd Cook. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7353841. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cook, Gregory) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dillard's Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Holder