This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2019 at 07:06:58 (UTC).

Allen v. City of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Allen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01082

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Landon Allen

Defendants

any other yet-unidentified officers of the Chicago Police Department

Officer Calvin Ridgell

Debra Kirby

City of Chicago

Karen Rowan

Philip J. Cline

Former Officer Kallatt Mohammed

Former CPD Sergeant Ronald Watts

Officer Gerome Summers

Sergeant Alvin Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott R. Rauscher

Attorney at Loevy and Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen Street, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Arthur R. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 North Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Jonathan I. Loevy

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen, 3Rd Fl

Chicago, IL 60607

Theresa H. Kleinhaus

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 North Aberdeen, 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Joshua Alan Tepfer

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

Allyson Lynn West

Attorney at Hale Law LLC

53 W Jackson Blvd., Suite 330

Chicago, IL 60604

William E. Bazarek

Attorney at Hale Law LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 330

Chicago, IL 60604

Anthony E. Zecchin

Attorney at Hale Law LLC

53 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 330

Chicago, IL 60604

Andrew M. Hale

Attorney at Hale Law LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 330

Chicago, IL 60604

Amy A. Hijjawi

Attorney at Hale Law LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 330

Chicago, IL 60604

Brian J Stefanich

Attorney at Hale Law LLC

53 West Jackson, Suite 330

Chicago, IL 60604

Ahmed A Kosoko

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

33 West Monroe Street, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Brian Patrick Gainer

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

33 West Monroe Street, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

Lisa Marie Mcelroy

Attorney at Johnson & Bell, Ltd.

33 W Monroe Street, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alvin Jones, Calvin Ridgell, Gerome Summers by William E. Bazarek (Bazarek, William) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alvin Jones, Calvin Ridgell, Gerome Summers by Brian J Stefanich (Stefanich, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alvin Jones, Calvin Ridgell, Gerome Summers by Anthony E. Zecchin (Zecchin, Anthony) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alvin Jones, Calvin Ridgell, Gerome Summers by Andrew M. Hale (Hale, Andrew) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alvin Jones, Calvin Ridgell, Gerome Summers by Amy A. Hijjawi (Hijjawi, Amy) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alvin Jones, Calvin Ridgell, Gerome Summers by Allyson Lynn West (West, Allyson) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ronald Watts by Ahmed A Kosoko (Kosoko, Ahmed) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ronald Watts by Lisa Marie Mcelroy (Mcelroy, Lisa) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ronald Watts by Brian Patrick Gainer (Gainer, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Landon Allen. Ronald Watts waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 3/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Andrea R. Wood is presiding over coordinated pretrial proceedings and Magistrate Judge Sheila M. Finnegan has been designated in a set of cases pursuant to an Executive Committee order dated July 12, 2018; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are within the scope of those pretrial proceedings; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Wood shall preside over the pretrial proceedings in the cases listed below, and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Finnegan shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases; and It is further ordered that these cases shall remain pending on the calendar of the judge to whom it is currently assigned, and that an order be entered in each case by Judge Wood at such time as coordinated pretrial proceedings have concluded. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/22/2019.(pk, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landon Allen by Theresa H. Kleinhaus (Kleinhaus, Theresa) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landon Allen by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landon Allen by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landon Allen by Joshua Alan Tepfer (Tepfer, Joshua) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Landon Allen by Scott R. Rauscher (Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Landon Allen; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15489989. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rauscher, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Former Officer Kallat Mohammed is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Alan Tepfer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R. Rauscher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arthur R. Loevy