This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2022 at 07:35:32 (UTC).

Allen et al v. Wright Medical Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01444

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vernon Allen

Melanie Allen

Defendants

Wright Medical Group, Inc.

Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Stokes

Attorney at STOKES LAW OFFICE

133 S. 11Th Street, Suite 350

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin F. Hormuth

Attorney at GREENSFELDER HEMKER PC - St Louis

10 S. Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102

David P. Niemeier

Attorney at GREENSFELDER HEMKER PC - St Louis

10 S. Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/15/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/25/2022 02:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/3/2022. (KEK) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

14 #3

Exhibit Wright Medical Advertisement dated April 25, 2008

14 #2

Exhibit Wright Medical Advertisement dated November 26, 2008

14 #1

Exhibit Wright Medical Advertisement dated December 24, 2007

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss :Count II by Plaintiff Vernon Allen. (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and V of Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Party Wright Medical Group by Plaintiff Vernon Allen. (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Niemeier for Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Niemeier, David) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Petition by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

5 #2

Attachment Proof of filing

5 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of Saint Louis, filed by Vernon Allen, Melanie Allen.(JKL) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Parent companies: Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. discloses that it is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Wright Medical Group, Inc., which is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Stryker Corporation., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: Stryker Corporation is a publicly traded corporation and owns 10% or more of the stock in Wright Medical Group, Inc.,. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/15/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/25/2022 02:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/3/2022. (KEK) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Plaintiff Vernon Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wright Medical Advertisement dated December 24, 2007, #2 Exhibit Wright Medical Advertisement dated November 26, 2008, #3 Exhibit Wright Medical Advertisement dated April 25, 2008)(Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss :Count II by Plaintiff Vernon Allen. (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and V of Plaintiffs' Petition filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and V of Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Party Wright Medical Group by Plaintiff Vernon Allen. (Stokes, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Petition by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Hormuth, Kevin) filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/16/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Niemeier for Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Niemeier, David) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Petition by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (JKL) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Transfer Venue by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Proof of filing)(JKL) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of Saint Louis, filed by Vernon Allen, Melanie Allen.(JKL) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Parent companies: Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. discloses that it is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Wright Medical Group, Inc., which is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Stryker Corporation., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: Stryker Corporation is a publicly traded corporation and owns 10% or more of the stock in Wright Medical Group, Inc.,. (Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, Missouri, case number 2122-CC09676, with receipt number AMOEDC-9021361, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Petition in Gass, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal in Gass, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hormuth, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Niemeier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin F. Hormuth