This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2022 at 20:04:43 (UTC).

Allen et al v. Weston Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Allen filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Weston Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Johnson and John F. Robbenhaar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00708

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fannie Marie Jim

Estate of Wayne Saltwater

Leonard Lee

Rosina T Merritt

Ruby B Silas

Jean Jones

Gary Smith

George L Sisco

Emerson Lee

Anita Hayes

Vernon Phillips

Juanita Kee

Lena J Jones

Cecilia Wallace

Wade Shorthair

Susie Scott

Roger Shaggy

Emma Mitchell

Evelyn M Lee

Defendant

Weston Solutions, Inc.

284 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Frances Griffing

Attorney at Egolf, Ferlic & Harwood LLC

123 West San Francisco St., Suite 200

Santa Fe, NM 87501

 

Court Documents

130 #1

Affidavit

130 #130

Main Document

129 #4

Exhibit D

129 #3

Exhibit C

129 #2

Exhibit B

129 #1

Exhibit A

129 #129

Main Document

#128

(#128) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (605 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 884 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 400 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION for Protective Order filed by State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Lai, Albert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

127 #2

Exhibit 2

#3

265 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

265 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

265 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

#264

#263

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

218 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) MOTION for Joinder IN OPPOSITION TO FEDERAL PARTIES MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA ISSUED BY SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION TO MATHY STANISLAUS by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Gilmour, John) Modified on 8/24/2021-motion termed per Order 1151 (18md2814) (cmm). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) RESPONSE in Opposition re (1048 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition Topics filed by Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Crusham, Joseph) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America re (605 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 884 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 400 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION for Protective Order filed by State of New Mexico Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Lai, Albert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) REPLY to New Mexico's Response to Objections to the Special Master's Order on New Mexico's Motion for Protective Order re (236 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 406 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 316 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 92 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 611 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 500 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 901 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Response in Opposition to Motion,, (544 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 338 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 444 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 649 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 114 in 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR, 1004 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 261 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK) Objections,, (980 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Order on Motion for Protective Order, (1039 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 665 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 461 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) Response, (605 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 884 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 400 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) MOTION for Protective Order , (929 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 416 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 621 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF) Reply to Response to Motion, filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Lai, Albert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc Certificate of Service of Kinross Gold Corporation and Kinross Gold U.S.A., Inc.'s Objections and Responses to the Allen Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Berge, Bradford) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) NOTICE by Weston Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Service Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Wechsler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) NOTICE by Harrison Western Construction Corporation OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FEDERAL PARTIES FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTON OF DOCUMENTS Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Yarbrough, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying ( 865 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss State of Utah and Environmental Restoration, LLC's Claims. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) NOTICE by Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Berge, Bradford) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) NOTICE by United States of America withdrawing Meghan Greenfield as counsel Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Greenfield, Meghan) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial by Joe C Allen, Joanna McDaniel, Navajo Nation, State of New Mexico, State of Utah. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Rowenko, Lana) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Navajo Nation of Extension of Time Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Walsh, Andrew) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTS TO JOINT STATUS REPORT by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson for (244 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Joint Status Report (JSR). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Resulting from August 5, 2019 Initial Scheduling Conference by Special Master Alan C. Torgerson. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Torgerson, Alan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re (97 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 212 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 244 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 383 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 279 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 206 in 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY) Joint Status Report (JSR) Supplement by Environmental Restoration, LLC Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (Avchen, Terry) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketChief United States District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk assign Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the presiding judge; and associate as a member case with the lead case in the multidistrict litigation case No. 1:18-md-2824-WJ. (mag) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joe C Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jacqueline S. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Corlivia Begaye, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Timothy Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Estate of Leon Jones, Estate of Rose Merritt, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Allen E Etsitty, Bertha A Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Riley Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sheila Jim, Virginia Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Herman John, Anne Johnson, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Jean Jones, Lena J Jones, Raymond Jones, Renita T Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood, Francine Kiefert, Florence B King, Marlena King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M Lee, Leonard Lee, Marie Lee, Michelle A Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T Merritt, Sherrell G Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M Mitchell, Lucy B Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marilyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Laverne Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Thomas Pete, Ramona Pettigrew, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B Sam, Lula Sandoval, Bobby Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, David Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L Simpson, George L Sisco, Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Gary Smith, Jerome Smith, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todacheene, Lewis Todacheene, Herbert Todacheenie, Irene Todacheenie, Charlie Todachinnie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A Tony Benally, Eva Tso, John Tso, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn Jr., Johnson Washburn Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G Willie, Esther A Yanito, Alice D Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie, Susie Yazzie (Griffing, Katharine) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6582869 re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Irita James, Bessie Tesswood, Ernest Benally, Perry Hayes, Marlene Dobey, Freddie Hobson, Rowena Littlehat, Lucy Dick, Norman Jim, Wilbert Cowboy, Jean Jones, Raymond G Willie, Leonard Lee, Susie Yazzie, Lorraine Black, Dorothy Phillips, Carol Anagal, Alfred Curley, Harrison Cattleman, Virginia Jim, Emerson Lee, David Shorthair, Darrell Jim, Roselyn Watchman, Lucy Rentz, Mary J Phillips, Timothy Ben, Wallace Hayes, Melvin Curley, Lula Sandoval, Mary Ann Manygoat, Sherrell G Mesa, Ronnie Ross, Raymond G Sells, Loretta Hatathley, Larry B Sam, Julie Harrison, Roselyn Toledo, Laura M Mitchell, Andy Begay, Harry Lane, Benjamin Clark, Kee Dan, Robert Bekise, Teddy Smallcanyon, Renita T Jones, Raymond Pettigrew, Harry Benally, Perfina Rockwell, Mary Jay, Charles Phillips, Marylita Begay, Lula Atcitty, Anne Johnson, George L Sisco, Tonita Nelson, Margaret Harrison, Irvin Yazzie, Jeannie Benally, Lewis Todacheene, Marlena King, Aaron Barber, Esther Mark, Bernadine Todechene, Michelle A Lee, Davidson Devore, Joanne Holliday, Sammy Charley, Bernita Begay, Roy Begay, Cynthia Madison, Etta Begaye, Charley Jim, Eric Smallcanyon, Mae Martin, Terri Lameman-Austin, Dorothy Todechine, Pearlene Benally, Sarah Slowman, Jenathan Begaye, Shalina Grandson, Bobby Sandoval, Martha Curtis, Lena Willie, Bessie S Pelt, Bessie Duncan, Lahoma Cly, Sarah A Tony Benally, Ramona Pettigrew, Roger L Simpson, Della Weston, Wayne Begay, Christina Silentman, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Estate of Leon Jones, Fannie Marie Jim, Florence B King, Priscilla Bigman, Marilyn Silas, Elsie Joe, Helen Tom, Tommy Draper, Annie Henry, Thomas T Tyler, Juanita Kee, Harry Peshlakai, Calvin Yazzie, Wilford Atson, Harold Williams, Ron Miller, Gerald Maryboy, Vernon Phillips, Helen Begay, Sarah Frank, Irene Todacheenie, John Lansing, Frank John, Charles D Phillips, Cheryl Armenta, Thurston Eddie, Bertha A Etsitty, Gloria Lane, Richard Begaye, Dora Todacheene, Jimmie Coolidge, Lynalla Benn, Shawna Hamm, Anthony Nabahe, Helen Howard, Charlene Begay, Sarah Police, Johnson Washburn Sr., Herbert Willie, Rachel Dee, Lenora Williams, Betty Begay, Vincent Todechene, Larena Benn, Joe C Allen, Laurence Bekise, Max Benally, Roger Sherman, Arlene Begay, Cornelia Weston, Betty Jones Nakai, Ella Redhouse, Mae Begay, Wanda Benally, Anita Hayes, Tom Blackhorse, Elizabeth Begay, Ivan Tyler, Laverne Nakai, Cecil Duncan, Wallace McGilbert, Raymond Oldman, Marie Yazzie, Flora Todechine, Ruby B Silas, Corlivia Begaye, Beverly Maxwell, Byron Nelson, Earl D Yazzie, Jonah Begay, Herman Enoah, Shandie Pioche, Jonah Jim, Robert Hayes, Duane Aspaas, David Ben, Thomas Pete, Esther A Yanito, Don Curley, Jerome Smith, Herman John, Wilson Phillips, Celeste Silas, Scott Brady, Elsie Henry, Lena J Jones, Rose Benally, Mary Enoah, Reyvette Grey, Mary Tso, Daisy Barber, Albert H Lee, Max Kellywood, Evelyn M Lee, Rena Fasthorse, Jay Yazzie, Louise Henderson, Bessie Shorthair, Charlie Todachinnie, Vernese Esplain, Wilma Charley, Crystal Grey, Darren Kee, Phillip Rentz, Alice D Yazzie, Stella Cly, Jerry Todacheene, James Mason, Paul Barber, Lucy B Mitchell, Francine Kiefert, Theron Jones, James Grant, Roger Barber, Mable Black, Doris Coolidge, Raymond Jones, John Tso, Alice Begay, Wesley Jones, Emma Mitchell, Emerson Hatathley, Geneva Jim, Annie Oldman, Ruby Nelson, Gene Fred, Jimmy Nakai, Steve Benally, Tom Horse, Susan Benally, Anna Vigil, Estate of Rose Merritt, Roselyn Lee, Jessie Johnson, Annie BlueEyes, Irene Livingston, Marie Lee, Andrew Brewster, Taylor Black, Herbert Todacheenie, Sheila Jim, Ada Lansing, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Eddie Jay, Harry S Nakai, Rose Ann Tanner, Robin Hayes, Judy Begay, Pauline D Nelson, Harrison Johnson, Jacqueline S. Begay, Lita Joe, Michael N Little, Susie Scott, Daisy Houser, Wade Shorthair, Nina Benally, Gary Smith, Hubert Harwood, Eva Tso, Carmelita Lowe, Esther Reddoor, Albert Bylilly, Sylvia Mitchell, Hilda Baldwin, Herman Hunt, Lorenzo Yazzie, Darlene Bronston, Sandra Begay, Darrell Clah, Roger Shaggy, Nelson Rockwell, Garry Jay, Loren Garnanez, Johnson Washburn Jr., Kyle Jim, Leontyne Atcitty, Rosina T Merritt, Clarence D Weston, Ruth Nez, Elton Dodge, Vernida Bissonette, Jacqueline L. Begay, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Marilyn Mustache, Allen E Etsitty, Cecilia Wallace, Huron Etsitty, James Simpson, Virginia Begay, Ella Silas, Dina Benally, Rechelleda Benallie, Susie Dodge, Daniel Jim, Caroline Begay, Riley Garnanez, Shirley Bia, Janice Frank, Janice Terri Brown, Eric Begay, Phyllis Valdez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Griffing, Katharine) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Joe C Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jacqueline S. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Corlivia Begaye, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Timothy Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr, Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Estate of Leon Jones, Estate of Rose Merritt, Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Allen E Etsitty, Bertha A Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Riley Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sheila Jim, Virginia Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Herman John, Anne Johnson, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Jean Jones, Lena J Jones, Raymond Jones, Renita T Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood, Francine Kiefert, Florence B King, Marlena King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M Lee, Leonard Lee, Marie Lee, Michelle A Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T Merritt, Sherrell G Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M Mitchell, Lucy B Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marilyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Laverne Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Thomas Pete, Ramona Pettigrew, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B Sam, Lula Sandoval, Bobby Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, David Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L Simpson, George L Sisco, Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Gary Smith, Jerome Smith, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todacheene, Lewis Todacheene, Herbert Todacheenie, Irene Todacheenie, Charlie Todachinnie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A Tony Benally, Eva Tso, John Tso, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn Jr., Johnson Washburn Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G Willie, Esther A Yanito, Alice D Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie, Susie Yazzie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffing, Katharine) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weston Solutions Inc. is a litigant