This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2021 at 11:52:05 (UTC).

Allen et al v. Templeman et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Templeman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00677

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Love Allen, Jr.

Diamond S. Trucking

Sandy Allen

Schellenburg Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Diamond S. Trucking, a domestic for-profit company - Diamond S Trucking

Donald Love Allen, Jr

Defendants

SAV Express Inc.

William Edward Templeman

Intervenor

Great West Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Eugene Hill

Attorney at Colbert Cooper Hill

415 Nw 11Th Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Eric L Clark

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus

2 West 2Nd Street, Suite 1000

Tulsa, OK 74103

Defendant and Intervenor Attorneys

Mehry Taremi

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr Ste 100

Norman, OK 73069

Daniel Khristian Jones

Attorney at Miller Johnson Jones Antonisse & White, PLLC

500 N.W. 6Th Street, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73069

Paulina Thompson

Attorney at Miller Johnson Jones Antonisse & White, PLLC

500 Nw 6Th Street, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

C.B. Moore

Attorney at Mills & Jones, PLLC

2760 Washington Dr., Ste #100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#26

23 #1

Exhibit GWCC's Complaint in Intervention

#23

22 #1

Exhibit SAV Counterclaim

#22

#21

#20

#19

#16

15 #1

Exhibit Ex 1_Death Certificate

#8

#7

#6

#5

2 #2

2 - Pet

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - OSCN Dkt Summ

#2

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent ORI Great West Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Great West Casualty Company) by Great West Casualty Company (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Great West Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to Amend-see 24 (Re: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim ) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Amend (submitted as part of #22 ) by SAV Express Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Intervene by Great West Casualty Company [Note: Attorney Paulina Thompson added to party Great West Casualty Company(pty:intv).] (With attachments) (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim by SAV Express Inc. (With attachments) (Thompson, Paulina) Modified on 2/10/2021; this is a two-part motion of which one part was filed - see 24 for Motion to Amend (sc, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by SAV Express Inc. ; (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paulina Thompson on behalf of SAV Express Inc. [Note: Attorney Paulina Thompson added to party SAV Express Inc.(pty:dft).] (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Lack of Capacity (Re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Capacity ) by Donald Love Allen, Jr, Sandy Allen, Schellenburg Enterprises, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Clark, Eric) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Donald Love Allen, Jr, Sandy Allen, Schellenburg Enterprises, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Clark, Eric) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Schellenburg Enterprises, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Blake Moore on behalf of SAV Express Inc. [Note: Attorney Christopher Blake Moore added to party SAV Express Inc.(pty:dft).] (Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mehry Taremi on behalf of SAV Express Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel Khristian Jones on behalf of SAV Express Inc. [Note: Attorney Daniel Khristian Jones added to party SAV Express Inc.(pty:dft).] (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT by SAV Express Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing SAV Express Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Creek County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2020-255 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2327730) by SAV Express Inc. (With attachments) (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by SAV Express Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against SAV Express Inc., William Edward Templeman by Sandy Allen, Donald Love Allen, Jr, Schellenburg Enterprises, Inc. (ll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/29/2020 to correct name of Defendant Schellenburg Enterprises (ll, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diamond S. Trucking is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paulina Thompson