This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 11:57:56 (UTC).

Allen et al v. MetLife et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Allen filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against MetLife. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jay K. Allen

Raleigh, NC 27610-2820

Kathy R Allen

Washington, DC 20019-6760

Defendants

L3Harris Technologies, Inc.

Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC

Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.

MetLife

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Douglas McKnight

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

8529 Six Forks Road, Forum Iv, Suite 600

Raleigh, NC 27615

Amanda S. Hawkins

Attorney at Brooks Pierce McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700

Raleigh, NC 27601

Shana L. Fulton

Attorney at Brooks Pierce McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700

Raleigh, NC 27601

Elizabeth J. Bondurant

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street Nw, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

26 #2

Envelope

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#25

(#25) Memorandum in Support regarding #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#24

(#24) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

18 #1

Envelope

#18

Motions No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#14

Motions No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#8

Motions No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

6 #3

Exhibit C - 11.27.15 Letter

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth J. Bondurant on behalf of MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file Notice of Self-Representation sent to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE Washington, DC 20019-6760 and Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road Raleigh, NC 27610-2820 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Pleadings

#1

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file Notice of Self-Representation sent to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE Washington, DC 20019-6760 and Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road Raleigh, NC 27610-2820 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #18 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiffs have up to and including June 21, 2021, within which to respond to the Motions to Dismiss #8 #14 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/11/2021. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Memorandum in Support regarding #24 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Kathy R Allen. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Electronic Service, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jay K. Allen. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jay K. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Consent to Electronic Service, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Shana L. Fulton on behalf of Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC. (Fulton, Shana) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Johnson Plan bates-stamped 1-76, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 11.10.15 letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 11.27.15 Johnson Conversion letter) (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by MetLife identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by MetLife. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan, #2 Exhibit B - 03.22.18 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 11.27.15 Letter) (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth J. Bondurant on behalf of MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file Notice of Self-Representation sent to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE Washington, DC 20019-6760 and Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road Raleigh, NC 27610-2820 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. from Wake Co. Superior Court, case number 21CVS03637. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5988964), filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where L3HARRIS TECHNOLOGIES is a litigant

Latest cases where METLIFE INC is a litigant