This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:29:02 (UTC).

Allen et al v. MetLife et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Allen filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against MetLife. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malcolm J. Howard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00572

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malcolm J. Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jay K. Allen

Raleigh, NC 27610

Kathy R Allen

Washington, DC 20019-6760

Defendants

L3Harris Technologies, Inc.

Mercer Health Benefits Administration, LLC

Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.

MetLife

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Douglas McKnight

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

P.O. Box 31608

Raleigh, NC 27622

William Sutton Cherry, III

Attorney at Manning Fulton & Skinner, P.A.

P. O. Box 20389, 3605 Glenwood Ave., Suite 500

Raleigh, NC 27619-0389

Elizabeth J. Bondurant

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street Nw, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

Madison B. Waller

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1100

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. In its discretion, the court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's motions [DE #28, 31, 33]. Plaintiffs shall have until March 20, 2020, to respond to L3Harris Technologies, Inc.'s motion to dismiss [DE #5] and MetLife's motion for judgment on the pleadings [DE #25]. Absent extenuating circumstances, these deadlines will not be further extended. Plaintiffs request for permission to file documents electronically is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 2/5/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

33 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#33

(#33) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

31 #2

Text of Proposed Order

31 #1

Request for Duplicate Copy of Verbatim Audio Court Record

#31

(#31) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond #25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Request for Duplicate Copy of Verbatim Audio Court Record, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

28 #2

Envelope

28 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#28

(#28) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #5 motion to dismiss filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Memorandum in Support regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Salaried Retiree Life Insurance Plan, #2 Exhibit November 10 2015 Letter to Rebecca Johnson, #3 Exhibit November 27 2015 Letter to Rebecca Johnson) (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#28) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #5 motion to dismiss filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance or a Notice of Self Representation. A copy sent via US Mail to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE, Washington, DC 20019-6760; Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road, Raleigh, NC 27610; William S. Cherry, III of Manning Fulton at 3605 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Raleigh, NC 2761; Elizabeth J. Bondurant, Aaron Pohlmann of Womble Bond Dickinson (US), LLP at 271 17th Street, Suite 2400, Atlanta, Georgia 30363 and Ronnie Brandes of Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., 1166 Avenue of the Americas, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10036. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance or a Notice of Self Representation. A copy sent via US Mail to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE, Washington, DC 20019-6760; Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road, Raleigh, NC 27610; William S. Cherry, III of Manning Fulton at 3605 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Raleigh, NC 2761; Elizabeth J. Bondurant, Aaron Pohlmann of Womble Bond Dickinson (US), LLP at 271 17th Street, Suite 2400, Atlanta, Georgia 30363 and Ronnie Brandes of Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., 1166 Avenue of the Americas, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10036. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. In its discretion, the court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's motions [DE #28, 31, 33]. Plaintiffs shall have until March 20, 2020, to respond to L3Harris Technologies, Inc.'s motion to dismiss [DE #5] and MetLife's motion for judgment on the pleadings [DE #25]. Absent extenuating circumstances, these deadlines will not be further extended. Plaintiffs request for permission to file documents electronically is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 2/5/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/5/2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #31 MOTION for Extension of Time, #33 MOTION for Extension of Time, #28 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond #25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Request for Duplicate Copy of Verbatim Audio Court Record, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit December 18, 2013 Letter, #2 Exhibit Lincoln Policy 574771, #3 Exhibit January 4, 2016 Letter, #4 Exhibit Lincoln Policy 1586296, #5 Exhibit Lincoln Policy 1586296 Termination Letter, #6 Exhibit Change of Beneficiary Form) (Cherry, William) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #5 motion to dismiss filed by Jay K. Allen, Kathy R Allen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice to Pro Se Party Regarding Response regarding #25 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. A copy mailed to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE, Washington, DC 20019-6760 and to Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road, Raleigh, NC 27610. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Memorandum in Support regarding #25 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MetLife. (Bondurant, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cherry, William) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co. (Cherry, William) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by William Sutton Cherry, III on behalf of Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.. (Cherry, William) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 1/16/2020. Rule 12 letter mailed via US Mail to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE, Washington, DC 20019-6760 and to Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road, Raleigh, NC 27610 mailed on December 23, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Support regarding #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Salaried Retiree Life Insurance Plan, #2 Exhibit November 10 2015 Letter to Rebecca Johnson, #3 Exhibit November 27 2015 Letter to Rebecca Johnson) (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Appearance or a Notice of Self Representation. A copy sent via US Mail to Kathy R. Allen at 26 55th Street NE, Washington, DC 20019-6760; Jay K. Allen at 2526 Poole Road, Raleigh, NC 27610; William S. Cherry, III of Manning Fulton at 3605 Glenwood Avenue, Suite 500, Raleigh, NC 2761; Elizabeth J. Bondurant, Aaron Pohlmann of Womble Bond Dickinson (US), LLP at 271 17th Street, Suite 2400, Atlanta, Georgia 30363 and Ronnie Brandes of Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., 1166 Avenue of the Americas, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10036. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by L3Harris Technologies, Inc., Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co. from Wake Co. Superior Court, case number 19cvs16013. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5231785), filed by L3Harris Technologies, Inc., Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (McKnight, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercer Health and Benefits Administration, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Heritage Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where L3HARRIS TECHNOLOGIES is a litigant

Latest cases where METLIFE INC is a litigant