This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2021 at 12:23:34 (UTC).

Allen et al v. Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc. (TV2)

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Air Components Systems, LTD , Inc TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00549

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christopher Richard Allen

Christin F. Allen

Christopher R. Allen

Defendant

Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Powers Glenn

Attorney at Griffith Law, PLLC

256 Seaboard Lane, Ste E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

Jonathan L Griffith

Attorney at Griffith Law, PLLC

256 Seaboard Lane, Ste E-106

Franklin, TN 37067

David Michael Boyd

Attorney at The Boyd Firm

900 South Gay Street, Suite 705

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan L. Griffith by Christin F. Allen, Christopher R. Allen. (Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#8

(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/29/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/29/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/29/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#5

(#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, #2 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, the s/signature of the attorney on the pleading must match the login credentials. (Copy of Administrative Notice mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Jonathan L Griffith is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

2 #1

Summons to Defendant Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc.

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons by Christin F. Allen, Christopher Richard Allen. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendant Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc.)(Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4601641.), filed by Christopher Richard Allen, Christin F. Allen.(Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 1/20/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #9 MOTION for for Jonathan L. Griffith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan L. Griffith by Christin F. Allen, Christopher R. Allen. (Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/29/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/29/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/29/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, #2 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, the s/signature of the attorney on the pleading must match the login credentials. (Copy of Administrative Notice mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Jonathan L Griffith is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Jonathan L Griffith) (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc. (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons by Christin F. Allen, Christopher Richard Allen. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendant Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc.)(Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Components & Systems, LTD., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4601641.), filed by Christopher Richard Allen, Christin F. Allen.(Glenn, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Powers Glenn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan L. Griffith