Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2020 at 08:28:11 (UTC).

Allen et al v. Campbell

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Allen filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Campbell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald E. Bush and David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00218

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ronald E. Bush

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Allen

Campbell Farms, Inc.

Camp River Holding, LLC

Camp Bench Holdings, LLC

Defendant

Neil Campbell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Edward Cather

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

350 Memorial Drive, Suite 300

Idaho Falls, ID 834002

Charles Edward Cather, III

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

350 Memorial Drive, Suite 300

Idaho Falls, ID 83402

John Elbert Cutler

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

350 Memorial Drive, Suite 300

Idaho Falls, ID 83402

Defendant Attorneys

Veronica Turner

Attorney at Turner Law Firm

35 Clivedon Lane

Phoenixville, PA 19460

John David Oborn

151 N 3Rd Ave - 2Nd Floor

Pocatello, ID 83205

Gary Lee Cooper

Attorney at COOPER and LARSEN

Po Box 4229

Pocatello, ID 83205-4229

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2020.(Cather, Charles)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Neil Campbell. Replies due by 7/9/2020.(Cooper, Gary)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment (Dkt. #5 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re #20 MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc. . (Cather, Charles)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing Charles Edward Cather, III appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/26/2020 (Cather, Charles)

14 #1

Memorandum

#14

(#16) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: On May 15, 2020, the Court stated #8 that if it deemed an expedited evidentiary hearing appropriate, it anticipated holding a hearing on Monday, June 1, 2020. Given the recently filed #14 Motion to Dismiss, the Court does not deem such a hearing appropriate at this time. This docket entry order should not be construed as a ruling on the merits of #5 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (mt)

7 #7

Exhibit Declaration of Michael Allen in Support of Motion for Expedited Evidenti

7 #6

Exhibit Declaration of Michael Allen in Support of Motion to Enforce Judgment

7 #5

Exhibit Judgment

7 #4

Exhibit Memorandum Decision and Order January 21, 2020

#6

(#22) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment (Dkt. #5 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#5

(#16) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: On May 15, 2020, the Court stated #8 that if it deemed an expedited evidentiary hearing appropriate, it anticipated holding a hearing on Monday, June 1, 2020. Given the recently filed #14 Motion to Dismiss, the Court does not deem such a hearing appropriate at this time. This docket entry order should not be construed as a ruling on the merits of #5 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (mt)

#3

(#8) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BE SERVED FORTHWITH. Plaintiffs shall execute service forthwith on the Defendant of the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ), Summons (Dkt. #3 ), and this Order. Plaintiffs shall notify the Court when Defendant has been properly served in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Upon receipt of service, Campbell will have 7 days, not counting the day he was served, to respond to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for ExpeditedEvidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on DeclaratoryJudgment (Dkt. #5 ). Plaintiffs will have 3 days to reply. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campbell Farms, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Campbell Farms, Inc. for Campbell Farms, Inc.. (Cather, Charles)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#8) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BE SERVED FORTHWITH. Plaintiffs shall execute service forthwith on the Defendant of the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ), Summons (Dkt. #3 ), and this Order. Plaintiffs shall notify the Court when Defendant has been properly served in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Upon receipt of service, Campbell will have 7 days, not counting the day he was served, to respond to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for ExpeditedEvidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on DeclaratoryJudgment (Dkt. #5 ). Plaintiffs will have 3 days to reply. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2020.(Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Neil Campbell. Replies due by 7/9/2020.(Cooper, Gary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment (Dkt. #5 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re #20 MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc. . (Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Entry of Judgmentor in the Alternative Renewed Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing Charles Edward Cather, III appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/26/2020 (Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING: A hearing on the #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Memorandum in Support is set for 9/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge David C. Nye. (ab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Memorandum in Support filed by Neil Campbell.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/4/2020.(Cooper, Gary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #5 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/29/2020. The reply was filed at dkt 17 on 5/28/20.(jp) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & Memorandum in Support of reply on motion for expedited evidentiary hearing on permanent injunction filed by Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. Replies due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order on February 19, 2019 in Case No. 4:19-cv-00046-BLW, #2 Exhibit Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand (Dkt. 35) in Case No. 4:19-cv-00046-BLW, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Allen (Dkt. 35-1) in Case No. 4:19-cv-00046-BLW, #4 Exhibit Excerpts of Deposition of Neil Campbell (June 3, 2019))(Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: On May 15, 2020, the Court stated #8 that if it deemed an expedited evidentiary hearing appropriate, it anticipated holding a hearing on Monday, June 1, 2020. Given the recently filed #14 Motion to Dismiss, the Court does not deem such a hearing appropriate at this time. This docket entry order should not be construed as a ruling on the merits of #5 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (mt)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Lee Cooper on behalf of Neil Campbell (Cooper, Gary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camp River Holding, LLC, Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. Neil Campbell served on 5/16/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cecilia Reid in Support of Proof of Service)(Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT BE SERVED FORTHWITH. Plaintiffs shall execute service forthwith on the Defendant of the Complaint (Dkt. #1 ), Summons (Dkt. #3 ), and this Order. Plaintiffs shall notify the Court when Defendant has been properly served in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Upon receipt of service, Campbell will have 7 days, not counting the day he was served, to respond to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for ExpeditedEvidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on DeclaratoryJudgment (Dkt. #5 ). Plaintiffs will have 3 days to reply. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment filed by Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Decision and Order September 3, 2019, #2 Exhibit Exhibit GG to the Declaration, #3 Exhibit Memorandum Decision and Order October 30, 2019, #4 Exhibit Memorandum Decision and Order January 21, 2020, #5 Exhibit Judgment, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Allen in Support of Motion to Enforce Judgment, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Allen in Support of Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction, #8 Exhibit Declaration of C. Edward Cather in Support of Emergency Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction, #9 Exhibit Declaration of John Cutler in Support of Motion to Enforce Judgment, #10 Exhibit Order dated April 29, 2020, #11 Exhibit Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Enforce Judgment, #12 Exhibit Petition for Further Relief, #13 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Enforce, #14 Exhibit Order dated May 5, 2020, #15 Exhibit Transcript)(Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Expedited Evidentiary Hearing on Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment Charles Edward Cather, III appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2020 (Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION for Permanent Injunction as Further Relief on Declaratory Judgment Charles Edward Cather, III appearing for Plaintiffs Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Camp River Holding, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2020 (Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND REASSIGNMENT OF CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald E. Bush no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:20-cv-218-DCN(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Neil Campbell. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campbell Farms, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Campbell Farms, Inc. for Campbell Farms, Inc.. (Cather, Charles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2045803.), filed by Camp River Holding, LLC, Michael Allen, Camp Bench Holdings, LLC, Campbell Farms, Inc. against Neil Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Cather, Charles) Modified on 5/8/2020 to reflect correct parties (ckh).

    Read MoreRead Less