This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2019 at 12:10:10 (UTC).

ALLEGHENY CLINIC v. TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 ALLEGHENY CLINIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00517

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGHENY CLINIC

Defendants

TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC

AUDREY LONGSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerri L. Sperling

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200, Four Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Gretchen E. Moore

Attorney at Strassburger, McKenna, Gutnick & Gefsky

Four Gateway Center, Suite 2200, 444 Liberty Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorney

Andrew M. Stone

Attorney at Stone Law Firm, LLC

437 Grant Street, 1806 Frick Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen E. Moore on behalf of ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Moore, Gretchen) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) REPLY BRIEF re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) BRIEF in Support re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sperling, Gerri) Modified text on 6/17/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) EXHIBITS A in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#8

(#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Conferral

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Conferral, #2 Proposed Order) (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#6

(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC, AUDREY LONGSON Answer due from TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC on 5/31/2019; AUDREY LONGSON on 5/31/2019. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER and PROCEDURES on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/9/19. (jms) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Errata re #3 Disclosure Statement by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. Reason for Correction: Title. (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen E. Moore on behalf of ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Moore, Gretchen) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER, Oral Argument on #7 Motion to Dismiss is hereby scheduled for 7/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jms) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY BRIEF re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ksa) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEF in Support re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sperling, Gerri) Modified text on 6/17/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBITS A in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AUDREY LONGSON, TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Conferral, #2 Proposed Order) (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC, AUDREY LONGSON Answer due from TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC on 5/31/2019; AUDREY LONGSON on 5/31/2019. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER and PROCEDURES on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/9/19. (jms) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Errata re #3 Disclosure Statement by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. Reason for Correction: Title. (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Sperling, Gerri) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC. (Stone, Andrew) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 19-005389 Copies attached: Complaint and Affidavit of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5124730), filed by TOTAL WELLNESS PSYCHIATRY, PLLC, AUDREY LONGSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service) (ksa) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerri L. Sperling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gretchen E. Moore(Designation Retained)