This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 10:49:06 (UTC).

Allan Groves v. U.S. Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Allan Groves filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against U S Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allan Groves, as Trustee for the 1435 Crescent Oak Trust

Houston, TX 77008

Allan Groves

Defendants

U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee on behalf of the Holders of the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-WMC4

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

U.S. Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Craig Jackson

Attorney at Jeffrey Jackson & Associates, PLLC

2500 E Tc Jester Blvd., Suite 285

Houston, TX 77008

Charles Daniel Brooks

Attorney at Jeffrey Jackson & Associates, PLLC

2500 E Tc Jester Blvd, Ste 285

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

Michael F Hord, Jr

Attorney at Hirsch Westheimer PC

1415 Louisiana, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002-2772

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by Allan Groves. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: March/April 2023. ETT: 3 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 4/29/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2022. Discovery due by 8/31/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2023.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

11 #2

Proposed Order ORDER

11 #1

Exhibit 1

11 #11

Main Document

10 #1

Proposed Scheduling and Docket Control Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Brooks on behalf of Allan Groves, filed. (Brooks, Charles) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Allan Groves, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order of Remand

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allan Groves, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Allan Groves, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee on behalf of the Holders of the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-WMC4, filed.(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #5

C-2

1 #2

B

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by Allan Groves. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2022. Scheduling order entered. Appearances: Charles Daniel Brooks, Michael F Hord, Jr.(ERO:Yes), filed.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: March/April 2023. ETT: 3 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 4/29/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2022. Discovery due by 8/31/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/30/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2023.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order ORDER)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Allan Groves, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling and Docket Control Order)(Brooks, Charles) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Brooks on behalf of Allan Groves, filed. (Brooks, Charles) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Allan Groves, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand by Allan Groves, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Remand)(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allan Groves, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Allan Groves, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/3/2022 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee on behalf of the Holders of the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-WMC4, filed.(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27582850) filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee on behalf of the Holders of the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-WMC4, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 C-1, #5 C-2, #6 C-3, #7 D)(Hord, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Craig Jackson