This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:54 (UTC).

ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY v. SHANGY, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHANGY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05743

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY

Defendant

SHANGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZACHARY JAY COHEN

Attorney at LESAVOY BUTZ & SEITZ LLC

1620 Pond Rd Suite 200

Allentown, PA 18104

JENNIFER BUTLER ROUTH

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

500 North Capitol St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

MICHAEL S. NADEL

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

600 Thirteenth St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Nadel by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(COHEN, ZACHARY) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed order

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer B. Routh by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(COHEN, ZACHARY) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY.(mas, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY (COHEN, ZACHARY) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SHANGY, INC., filed by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY. ( Receipt # to be added). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/6/19. 12/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY (COHEN, ZACHARY) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Nadel by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(COHEN, ZACHARY) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer B. Routh by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(COHEN, ZACHARY) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/6/19. 12/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY.(mas, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY. (mas, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Summons Issued as to SHANGY, INC.. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/5/19 (mas, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SHANGY, INC., filed by ALLAGASH BREWING COMPANY. ( Receipt # to be added). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.