This case was last updated from PACER on 03/04/2020 at 14:54:21 (UTC).

ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC v. ART OF GUTTER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ART OF GUTTER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer, Madeline Cox Arleo and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17150

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

Referral Judges

Michael A. Hammer

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC

Defendants

UMIT KARABACAK

ADNAN KARABACAK

ART OF GUTTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD B. CALMANN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

MONVAN HU

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

One Gateway Center, 10Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN

Attorney at SAIBER LLC

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 200

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Defendant Attorney

MARK BERKOWITZ

Attorney at AMSTER ROTHSTEIN & EBENSTEIN LLP

90 Park Avenue, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sandra A. Hudak to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10429686.) (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #25 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sandra A. Hudak, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/3/20. (jc, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

27 #3

Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz

27 #2

Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz

27 #1

Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz

25 #3

Text of Proposed Order

25 #2

Certification of Sandra A. Hudak in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission

25 #1

Certification of Mark Berkowitz in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#25

(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sandra A. Hudak by ART OF GUTTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mark Berkowitz in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sandra A. Hudak, #2 Certification of Sandra A. Hudak in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. ART OF GUTTER, INC. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MONVAN HU on behalf of ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC (HU, MONVAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN on behalf of ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ART OF GUTTER, INC., ADNAN KARABACAK, UMIT KARABACAK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (qa, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ART OF GUTTER, INC., ADNAN KARABACAK, UMIT KARABACAK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916275) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) Modified on 8/23/2019 (sms). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, SANDRA A. HUDAK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (bt, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sandra A. Hudak to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10429686.) (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #25 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sandra A. Hudak, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/3/20. (jc, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to case. (ps, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ART OF GUTTER, INC. re #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz, #2 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz, #3 Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz, #4 Exhibit 5 to Supplemental Declaration of Mark Berkowitz)(BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sandra A. Hudak. Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MONVAN HU terminated. (HU, MONVAN) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sandra A. Hudak by ART OF GUTTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mark Berkowitz in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sandra A. Hudak, #2 Certification of Sandra A. Hudak in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE MAGDY SOLIMAN on behalf of ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC (SOLIMAN, CATHERINE) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESET Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion RESET for 2/3/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. ADNAN KARABACAK served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. UMIT KARABACAK served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. ART OF GUTTER, INC. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MONVAN HU on behalf of ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC (HU, MONVAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN on behalf of ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC (HALPERN, JAKOB) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ART OF GUTTER, INC., ADNAN KARABACAK, UMIT KARABACAK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (qa, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ART OF GUTTER, INC., ADNAN KARABACAK, UMIT KARABACAK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916275) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALL WEATHER ARMOUR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CALMANN, ARNOLD) Modified on 8/23/2019 (sms). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.