This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 10:46:30 (UTC).

All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. v. The U.S. Small Business Administration et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 All Sorts of Services of America, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against The U S Small Business Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas P. Barber. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01688

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

All Sorts of Services of America, Inc.

Appellees

Jovita Carranza

The U.S. Small Business Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Richard J. Cole, III

Attorney at Cole & Cole Law, P.A.

46 N Washington Blvd Ste 24

Sarasota, FL 34236

Appellee Attorney

Christopher John Emden

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM*

Suite 3200, 400 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) PERMANENT INJUNCTION. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (ANL) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Judge Michael G. Williamson Memorandum Opinion

#7

(#7) ORDER: All Sorts' "Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. [2-21]) is granted. The "United States' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. [2-25]) is denied. The parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed judgement by 5:00 p.m. on Monday August 3, 2020. If, after conferring, they cannot agree on a proposed judgment, each party may submit a separate proposal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Michael G. Williamson Memorandum Opinion)(ANL) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#5

(#5) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: MOTION HEARING held on 7/31/2020 re #3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate filed by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (SRC) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. (Cole, Richard) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

2 #21

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_1_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Hearing_Schedule

2 #20

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000012_Motion_to_Determine_Whether_Proceeding_Is_Core_File

2 #19

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000011_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Granting_Emergency_Motion

2 #18

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000010_Order_Granting_Emergency_Motion_on_Complaint_for_De

2 #17

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000009_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_

2 #16

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_4_Exhibit_2_-_SBA_Form_147

2 #15

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_3_Miller_Declaration_Exhibit_A_-_SBA_Form_1919

2 #14

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_2_Exhibit_1_-_Miller_Declaration

2 #13

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_1_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Verified_Complaint_fo

2 #12

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000006_Notice_of_Hearing_Filed_by_Richard_John_Cole_III_on

2 #5

8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_2_Exhibit_A

2 #1

2 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder. scottgrmr@aol.com (SNG) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 31, 2020 before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott N. Gamertsfelder,Telephone number 813.301.5898. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 10/2/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020. (SNG) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PERMANENT INJUNCTION. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (ANL) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: All Sorts' "Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. [2-21]) is granted. The "United States' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment" (Doc. [2-25]) is denied. The parties are directed to confer and submit a proposed judgement by 5:00 p.m. on Monday August 3, 2020. If, after conferring, they cannot agree on a proposed judgment, each party may submit a separate proposal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Michael G. Williamson Memorandum Opinion)(ANL) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's "Motion to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request for Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020" (Doc. #3) is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2020. (ANL) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: MOTION HEARING held on 7/31/2020 re #3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate filed by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (SRC) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of ZOOM hearing on #3 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas P. Barber. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom invitation via email. (SRC) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and Request of Ruling Prior to August 8, 2020. See Special Langauge Under L.R. 3.01(g) Certificate by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. (Cole, Richard) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: #1 2 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #2 3 Response to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #3 4 Public Docket - Adversary Proceeding, #4 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_1_Verified_Complaint_by_All_Sorts_of_Services_of_America_Inc_against_Small_Business_Admini, #5 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #6 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #7 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000001_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #8 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000002_Summons_issued_on_Small_Business_Administration_Jovita_Corranza_along_with_Local_Rule_700, #9 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000003_Service_Executed_on_Jovita_Carranza_and_US_Small_Business_Administration_of_Summons_Com, #10 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000004_Emergency_Motion_to_Expedite_Hearing, #11 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000005_Certificate_of_Necessity_for_Emergency_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Emergency_Hearing_on_Complain, #12 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000006_Notice_of_Hearing_Filed_by_Richard_John_Cole_III_on_behalf_of_Plaintiff_All_Sorts_of_Servi, #13 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_1_Response_to_Plaintiffs_Verified_Complaint_for_Declaratory_Judgment_Writ_of_Mandamus_and, #14 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_2_Exhibit_1_-_Miller_Declaration, #15 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_3_Miller_Declaration_Exhibit_A_-_SBA_Form_1919, #16 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000008_Part_4_Exhibit_2_-_SBA_Form_147, #17 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000009_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Richard_Cole, #18 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000010_Order_Granting_Emergency_Motion_on_Complaint_for_Declaratory_Judgment_Writ_of_Mandamus_an, #19 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000011_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Granting_Emergency_Motion_to_Expedite_Hearing_Filed_by_Richard, #20 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000012_Motion_to_Determine_Whether_Proceeding_Is_Core_Filed_by_Christopher_J_Emden_on_behalf_of_D, #21 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_1_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Hearing_Scheduled_for_July_8_2020_at_930_am_Filed_by_Richa, #22 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #23 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #24 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000013_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #25 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_1_Cross_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Debtors_Verified_Complaint_for_Declaratory_Judgment, #26 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_2_Memorandum_In_Support_of_Cross_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment, #27 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_3_Exhibit_1_-_Miller_Declaration, #28 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_4_MIller_Declaration_Exhibit_A_-_SBA_Form_1919, #29 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000014_Part_5_Exhibit_2_-_SBA_Form_147, #30 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000015_Supplemental_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Filed_by_Christopher_J_Emden_on_behalf_of_Defendan, #31 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000016_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Richard_John_Cole_III_on_beha, #32 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000017_Transmittal_of_Motion_for_Withdrawal_of_Reference_to_District_Court_Case_No_820-cv-0155, #33 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000018_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Richard_Cole, #34 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000019_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #35 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000021_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Case_Law_in_Support_of_Plaintiffs_Position_that_Proceeding_is_Core_Filed, #36 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000021_Part_2_Skefos_v_Carranza_2020_Bankr_LEXIS_1479, #37 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000022_Order_entered_on_July_17_2020_by_District_Court_Judge_Mary_S_Scriven_Re_Appeal_on_Civi, #38 8-20-ap-00333_Docket_000023_Transmittal_of_Withdrawal_of_Reference_to_District_Court_Case_No_820-cv-01688-DJ_-_Judg)(JN) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Jovita Carranza, The U.S. Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal, #2 Exhibit Response)(LD) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less