This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:35:52 (UTC).

All European Auto Supply, Inc. v. Denso Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 All European Auto Supply, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Denso Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg, David R. Grand, Mona K. Majzoub and Marianne O. Battani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10980

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Terrence G. Berg

Marianne O. Battani

Referral Judges

David R. Grand

Mona K. Majzoub

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All European Auto Supply, Inc.

Defendants

DENSO Korea Corporation

Denso Corporation

Denso Automotive Deutschland GmbH

Denso International America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H. Fink

Attorney at Fink Associates Law

38500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 350

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Nathan J. Fink

Attorney at Fink Associates Law

38500 Woodward Ave, Suite 350

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH THE DENSO DEFENDANTS AND PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER SETTLEMENT CLASSES re #11 Order on Motion - Free,. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH THE DENSO DEFENDANTS AND PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER SETTLEMENT CLASSES. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#9

(#9) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements With the DENSO Defendants and for Provisional Certification of the Direct Purchaser Settlement Class by All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, Nathan) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued for *Denso International America, Inc.* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued for *Denso Corporation* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued for *Denso Automotive Deutschland GmbH* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *DENSO Korea Corporation* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

3 #17

Exhibit 16

3 #13

Exhibit 12

3 #12

Exhibit 11

3 #11

Exhibit 10

3 #10

Exhibit 9

3 #7

Exhibit 6

3 #6

Exhibit 5

3 #5

Exhibit 4

#2

(#2) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of DPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements With the DENSO Defendants and for Provisional Certification of the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes by All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH THE DENSO DEFENDANTS AND PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER SETTLEMENT CLASSES re #11 Order on Motion - Free,. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS WITH THE DENSO DEFENDANTS AND PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THE DIRECT PURCHASER SETTLEMENT CLASSES. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of DPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements With the DENSO Defendants and for Provisional Certification of the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes filed by All European Auto Supply, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Amended MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements With the DENSO Defendants and for Provisional Certification of the Direct Purchaser Settlement Class by All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, Nathan) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued for *Denso International America, Inc.* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued for *Denso Corporation* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued for *Denso Automotive Deutschland GmbH* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued for *DENSO Korea Corporation* (DWor) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements With the DENSO Defendants and for Provisional Certification of the Direct Purchaser Settlement Class by All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18) (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of DPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements With the DENSO Defendants and for Provisional Certification of the Direct Purchaser Settlement Classes by All European Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All European Auto Supply, Inc. against DENSO Korea Corporation, Denso Automotive Deutschland GmbH, Denso Corporation, Denso International America, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7181825 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 12-md-02311 and 13-cv-02501, Judge Marianne O. Battani] (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less