This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 07:40:01 (UTC).

All About Property, LLC v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 All About Property, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01431

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL ABOUT PROPERTY, LLC

Defendants

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.

BANK OF AMERICA, NA

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Craig Jackson

Attorney at Jeffrey Jackson & Associates, PLLC

2500 E Tc Jester Blvd., Suite 285

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorneys

Taylor William Meek

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

2000 Mckinney Ave., Ste. 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Melissa Sue Gutierrez

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

600 Travis Street, Ste 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Jon Howard Patterson

Attorney at Bradley Arant et al

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Gabriella Elise Alonso

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, filed.(Meek, Taylor) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#12

(#12) Discovery ORDER. By 7/1/2022, written discovery must be exchanged. By 7/15/2022, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. Internal review set for 7/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#11

(#11) Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 6/9/2022. Order to be entered. Appearances: Jeffrey Jackson, Danny Brooks, Taylor Meek, Melissa Gutierrez. (Court Reporter: K. Miller) (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Federal National Mortgage Association served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by All About Property, LLC, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#8

(#8) Order: Initial Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Federal National Mortgage Association, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Lis Pendens by All About Property, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of All About Property, LLC, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, filed.(Gutierrez, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, filed.(Meek, Taylor) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Discovery ORDER. By 7/1/2022, written discovery must be exchanged. By 7/15/2022, the parties must jointly report the status of this case and the next steps to advance this litigation. Internal review set for 7/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 6/9/2022. Order to be entered. Appearances: Jeffrey Jackson, Danny Brooks, Taylor Meek, Melissa Gutierrez. (Court Reporter: K. Miller) (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Federal National Mortgage Association served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by All About Property, LLC, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order: Initial Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Federal National Mortgage Association, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Lis Pendens by All About Property, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of All About Property, LLC, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, filed.(Gutierrez, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st District Court of Harris County, case number 2022-19434 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28127879) filed by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC, CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gutierrez, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All About Properties, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant