This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2023 at 09:40:39 (UTC).

Alkoudmani v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Alkoudmani filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rasha Alkoudmani

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ur M Jaddou

Ted H Kim

Houston Asylum Office

Marie Hummert

Matthew D. Emrich

Christopher A Wray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis G Jubran

Attorney at Abusharar and Associates

501 N Brookhurst St, Suite 202

Anaheim, CA 92801

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce St, 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75242

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) FINAL JUDGMENT This judgment is issued pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 58(a). This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED that this suit is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk shall transmit a true copy of this judgment to the parties. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/7/2022) (jgg) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(1)(a)(i). ECF No. 23. In the notice, Plaintiff seeks to voluntarily dismiss the above-captioned case without prejudice against all named Defendants. Id. at 2. The Court thus ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/7/2022) (jgg) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Dismissal re: #1 Complaint, filed by Rasha Alkoudmani (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#22

(#22) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ added as AUSA. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

#21

(#21) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (jgg) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

20 #1

*Restricted*

20 #20

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#19

(#19) ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/16/2022. (lctjk1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) FINAL JUDGMENT This judgment is issued pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 58(a). This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED that this suit is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk shall transmit a true copy of this judgment to the parties. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/7/2022) (jgg) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(1)(a)(i). ECF No. 23. In the notice, Plaintiff seeks to voluntarily dismiss the above-captioned case without prejudice against all named Defendants. Id. at 2. The Court thus ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/7/2022) (jgg) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Dismissal re: #1 Complaint, filed by Rasha Alkoudmani (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ added as AUSA. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (jgg) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-02156. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/28/2022. (zkh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/16/2022. (lctjk1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss filed by MATTHEW D. EMRICH, HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE, MARIE HUMMERT, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. (Tepe, Sean) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Memorandum in opposition to re #16 Motion to Transfer Case,, Motion to Dismiss, filed by RASHA ALKOUDMANI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 7/25/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 7/25/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 7/25/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARIE HUMMERT served on 7/25/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 7/25/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/25/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/26/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9388384) filed by Rasha Alkoudmani. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/30/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less