This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 07:53:17 (UTC).

ALIVIA UCHITEL v. SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 ALIVIA UCHITEL filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01790

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALIVIA UCHITEL

Defendant

SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC. doing business as J.P. MASCARO & SONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDO I. RIVERA

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust Street, 9Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC. D/B/A J.P. MASCARO & SONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15908612.), filed by ALIVIA UCHITEL.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 5/11/2022 (sg) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 5/11/2022 (sg) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALIVIA UCHITEL. (JL) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SOLID WASTE SERVICES, INC. D/B/A J.P. MASCARO & SONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15908612.), filed by ALIVIA UCHITEL.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDCO WASTE & RECYCLING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDO I. RIVERA