This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 12:40:36 (UTC).

Aliff et al v. Vervent, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 Aliff filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Vervent, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and Dana M. Sabraw. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00697

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jody Aliff

Heather Turrey

Marie Smith

Defendants

Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas

Lawrence Chiavaro

David Johnson

Activate Financial, LLC

Christopher Schuler

Vervent, Inc.

First Associates Loan Servicing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy G. Blood

Attorney at Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 1490

San Diego, CA 92101

Irv Ackelsberg

Attorney at Langer Grogan & Diver, PC

1717 Arch Street, Suite 4020

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Paul Arons

Attorney at Law Offices of Paul Arons

685 Spring Street, Suite 104

Friday Harbor, WA 98250

Defendant Attorneys

Forrest Royce Hansen

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30Th South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ryan Edward Borneman

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jason H. Dang

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

750 B Street, Suite 2900

San Diego, CA 92101

Patricia Pichon Hollenbeck

Attorney at Duane Morris

750 B Street, Suite 2900

San Diego, CA 92101-4681

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13971807.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Borneman, Ryan) (rmc). (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#18

(#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13971733.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hansen, Forrest) (rmc). (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Arons on behalf of Jody Aliff, Marie Smith, Heather Turrey (Arons, Paul)Attorney Paul Arons added to party Jody Aliff(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Arons added to party Marie Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Arons added to party Heather Turrey(pty:pla) (aef). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Vervent, Inc. served. (Blood, Timothy)(aef). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H. Dang on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Dang, Jason)Attorney Jason H. Dang added to party Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas of case(s) In re ITT Educational Services, Inc, No. 16-07207 (Bankr. S.D. Ind. 2016); Jorge Villalba, et al., v. ITT Educational Services, Inc., et al., No. 17-50003 (Bankr. S.D. Ind. 2017); and Caruso v. Peaks Trust 2009-1, Adversary Proceeding No: 18-50272 (Bankr. S.D. Ind. 2018) . (Hollenbeck, Patricia)(aef). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Hollenbeck, Patricia) (aef). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

9 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before June 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/11/2020. (aef) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Lawrence Chiavaro served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Christopher Schuler served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. David Johnson served. (Blood, Timothy)(aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Activate Financial, LLC served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Vervent, Inc. served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Activate Financial, LLC, Lawrence Chiavaro, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, David Johnson, Christopher Schuler, Vervent, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13732466.), filed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-697-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Blood, Timothy)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#21) PRO HAC APPROVED: Forrest Royce Hansen appearing for Defendant Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docket(#20) PRO HAC APPROVED: Ryan Edward Borneman appearing for Defendant Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13971807.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Borneman, Ryan) (rmc). (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13971733.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hansen, Forrest) (rmc). (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Arons on behalf of Jody Aliff, Marie Smith, Heather Turrey (Arons, Paul)Attorney Paul Arons added to party Jody Aliff(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Arons added to party Marie Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Arons added to party Heather Turrey(pty:pla) (aef). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Vervent, Inc. served. (Blood, Timothy)(aef). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H. Dang on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (Dang, Jason)Attorney Jason H. Dang added to party Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas of case(s) In re ITT Educational Services, Inc, No. 16-07207 (Bankr. S.D. Ind. 2016); Jorge Villalba, et al., v. ITT Educational Services, Inc., et al., No. 17-50003 (Bankr. S.D. Ind. 2017); and Caruso v. Peaks Trust 2009-1, Adversary Proceeding No: 18-50272 (Bankr. S.D. Ind. 2018) . (Hollenbeck, Patricia)(aef). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Hollenbeck, Patricia) (aef). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#12) PRO HAC APPROVED: Irv Ackelsberg appearing for Plaintiffs Jody Aliff, Marie Smith, Heather Turrey (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before June 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/11/2020. (aef) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' (Vervent, Inc., Activate Financial, LLC, Christopher Shuler, Lawrence Chiavaro and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas) Responsive Pleadings by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hollenbeck, Patricia)Attorney Patricia Pichon Hollenbeck added to party Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Lawrence Chiavaro served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Christopher Schuler served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. David Johnson served. (Blood, Timothy)(aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Activate Financial, LLC served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. Vervent, Inc. served. (Blood, Timothy) (aef). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Activate Financial, LLC, Lawrence Chiavaro, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, David Johnson, Christopher Schuler, Vervent, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13732466.), filed by Marie Smith, Jody Aliff, Heather Turrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-697-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Blood, Timothy)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Associates Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Activate Financial, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Arons