This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2021 at 08:11:07 (UTC).

Alicea v. Cincinnati Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Alicea filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cincinnati Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George A. OToole, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11444

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George A. OToole, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Alicea

Defendants

Cincinnati Incorporated

New Automation Corporation

New Automation Corporation doing business as PythonX doing business as Burlington Automation doing business as The Lincoln Electric Company doing business as Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter J. Ainsworth

Attorney at Meehan, Boyle, Black & Bogdanow, P.C.

100 Cambridge Street, Suite 2101

Boston, MA 02114

Robert F. Foster

Attorney at Meehan, Boyle, Black & Bogdanow, P.C.

100 Cambridge Street, Suite 2101

Boston, MA 02114

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher A. Duggan

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

Andrew D. Black

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP.

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1, Process

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover

1 #3

Exhibit Category Form

#2

#3

#6

(#6) Cincinnati Incorporated's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cincinnati Incorporated.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Cincinnati Incorporated's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cincinnati Incorporated.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Black on behalf of Cincinnati Incorporated (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cincinnati Incorporated. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cincinnati Incorporated ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8930573 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Black

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Duggan