This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 16:59:29 (UTC).

Alicea v. B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2022 Alicea filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against B Braun Interventional Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric R. Komitee and Marcia M. Henry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06241

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

Referral Judge

Marcia M. Henry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noemi Alicea

Defendants

B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc.

B. Braun Medical Inc.

B. Braun S.A.S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Jean Baughman

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel I.A. Smulian

Alena Michele Markley

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Letter Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Noemi Alicea (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (PB) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Letter MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, Request for Pre-Motion Conference re motion to dismiss the complaint by B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S. (Smulian, Daniel) Modified on 11/23/2022 (AG). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S identifying Corporate Parent B. Braun of America Inc. for B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc.. (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Letter MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, Request for Pre-Motion Conference re motion to dismiss the complaint filed by Noemi Alicea. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alena Michele Markley on behalf of B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Markley, Alena) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16040899 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Noemi Alicea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 10/16/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alena Michele Markley on behalf of B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Markley, Alena) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 Letter MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, Request for Pre-Motion Conference re motion to dismiss the complaint filed by Noemi Alicea. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketNOTICE -- Defendants submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference on an anticipated motion to dismiss on November 17, 2022. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that pursuant to Rule III.B.4 of Judge Komitee's # Individual Rules and Practices , Plaintiff is required to serve and file a letter response of three pages or less, within five days of service of Defendants' letter. (AG) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketIncorrect Case/Document/Entry Information re #4 Letter MOTION for Hearing electronically filed by Daniel I.A. Smulian, Esq. Requests for a pre-motion conference addressed to Judge Komitee must be filed using the Pre Motion Conference event found in the Motions section of the Motions and Related Filings section. No corrective action is required at this time, do not refile your document. (AG) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S identifying Corporate Parent B. Braun of America Inc. for B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc.. (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S (Smulian, Daniel) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Letter MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, Request for Pre-Motion Conference re motion to dismiss the complaint by B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S. (Smulian, Daniel) Modified on 11/23/2022 (AG). (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (PB) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (PB) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Letter Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Noemi Alicea (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (PB) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B. Braun S.A.S filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16040899 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Noemi Alicea. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 10/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less