This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2023 at 02:00:46 (UTC).

ALI et al v. AL-NAHYAN et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 ALI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AL-NAHYAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMIN ALLAWI ALI

AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI

KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID

ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN

MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN

FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI

YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD

Defendants

MOHAMED BEN ZAYED AL-NAHYAN

MOHAMMED BIN RASHID AL MAKTOUM

MOHAMED BIN SALMAN AL SAOUD

HAMAD MOHAMED THANI AL RUMAITHI

ABDULRAHMAN BEN SALEH AL-BUNYAN

FAYYADH AL-RUWAILI

RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION

GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

GREGORY J. HAYES

JIM TAICLEY

PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terrence P. Collingsworth

Defendant Attorneys

Ze-wen Julius Chen

Daniel L. Russell, Jr.

Christopher Nicholas Manning

Matthew S. Hellman

Andrew Merrick

Michael A. Doornweerd

Other Attorneys

Lisa Newman

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION (Manning, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Nicholas Manning on behalf of LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, JIM TAICLEY (Manning, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Name Change by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Russell, Jr on behalf of GREGORY J. HAYES, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, ANTONY J. BLINKEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Lisa) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hellman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Merrick on behalf of PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC (Merrick, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

3 #16

Summons

3 #10

Summons

3 #6

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/3/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD, KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID, ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN, AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI, FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI, AMIN ALLAWI ALI, MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN re #1 Complaint, filed by YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD, KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID, ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN, AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI, FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI, AMIN ALLAWI ALI, MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID, ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN, YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD, FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI, MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN, AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI, AMIN ALLAWI ALI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Collingsworth, Terrence) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Russell, Jr on behalf of GREGORY J. HAYES, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Russell, Daniel).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 9/15/2023. (zmrl) (Entered: 09/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION (Manning, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Nicholas Manning on behalf of LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, JIM TAICLEY (Manning, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Name Change by RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Russell, Jr on behalf of GREGORY J. HAYES, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Russell, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, ANTONY J. BLINKEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Lisa) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hellman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Merrick on behalf of PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC (Merrick, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Doornweerd on behalf of PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC (Doornweerd, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Hellman on behalf of PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC (Hellman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion to Extend Time for General Dynamics Corporation to File a Responsive Pleading, Dkt. #7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that General Dynamics Corporation shall file a responsive pleading on or before July 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/22/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellman, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION (Hellman, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Hellman on behalf of GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION (Hellman, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to MOHAMMED BIN RASHID AL MAKTOUM, HAMAD MOHAMED THANI AL RUMAITHI, MOHAMED BIN SALMAN AL SAOUD, ABDULRAHMAN BEN SALEH AL-BUNYAN, MOHAMED BEN ZAYED AL-NAHYAN, FAYYADH AL-RUWAILI, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, ANTONY BLINKEN, GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION, GREGORY J. HAYES, LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION, PHEOBE NOVAKOVIC, RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, JIM TAICLEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD, KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID, ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN, AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI, FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI, AMIN ALLAWI ALI, MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN re #1 Complaint, filed by YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD, KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID, ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN, AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI, FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI, AMIN ALLAWI ALI, MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by KHALED ALI SALEM CHAID, ALI AHMAD ALI ABAD AL ROWEISHAN, YOUSRA ABD EL AZIZ MHAMAD AAMAD, FATIMA MHAMAD AL BAYAHI AL KHARABI, MOHAMAD ALI HAMOUD AL ROWEISHAN, AYMAN MHAMAD SALEH AL SANABANI, AMIN ALLAWI ALI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Collingsworth, Terrence) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/3/2023. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to tc@iradvocates.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue. (zljn, ) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9896425) filed by Yousra Abd El Aziz Mhamad Aamad, Khaled Ali Salem Chaib, Ali Ahmad Ali Abad Al Roweishan, Ayman Mhamad Saleh Al Sanabani, Fatima Mhamad Al Bayahi AL Kharabi, AMIN ALLAWI ALI, Mohamad Ali Hamoud Al Roweishan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collingsworth, Terrence) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/3/2023) (zljn). (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less