This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:31:30 (UTC).

Ali #462773 v. Stranley et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Ali 462773 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Stranley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Omar Khattim Ali #462773

Kincheloe, MI 49784

Defendants

Ressie Stranley

Mellindy Chapin

Alexsandra Wilonawski

Connie Horton

URF Special Health Care

Robbin Waybrant

Sandra Wilson

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#10

(#10) OPINION; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.18 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, jas) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT re Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #7 by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (slk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

7 #1

Financial Documents

#7

(#7) PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity and a Trust Account Statement for the past six months submitted by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - miscellaneous attachments

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (affidavit) by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - miscellaneous attachments) (slk) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#5

(#5) SUPPLEMENT re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (Appendix 4 - Affidavit) by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (slk) Modified text on 4/16/2019 to note that this document does not clear deficiency (slk). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (slk) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 4/22/2019 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #1

Attachment 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #11 , Opinion (Screening) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Omar Khattim Ali (mlc) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) OPINION; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Omar Khattim Ali (mlc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.18 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, jas) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT re Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #7 by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (slk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity and a Trust Account Statement for the past six months submitted by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (affidavit) by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - miscellaneous attachments) (slk) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUPPLEMENT re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (Appendix 4 - Affidavit) by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (slk) Modified text on 4/16/2019 to note that this document does not clear deficiency (slk). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (slk) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Deficiency Order, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Omar Khattim Ali (slk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 4/22/2019 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Omar Khattim Ali #462773 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less