This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 08:12:38 (UTC).

Alfred Fant v. Experian

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Alfred Fant filed an Other lawsuit against Experian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07671

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alfred Fant

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant

Experian

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons for Experian

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

(#9) ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES AND CLOSING CASE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: On 9/29/2021, the Court DENIED plaintiffs request to file the action without prepayment of the full filing fee with leave to amend. Plaintiff was advised to resubmit the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Complaint with a certified copy of the Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization within 30 days, and failure to do so would result in closure of the case #6 . Plaintiff has failed to submit a timely response. Accordingly, the Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees is DENIED and the case is closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES AND CLOSING CASE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: On 9/29/2021, the Court DENIED plaintiffs request to file the action without prepayment of the full filing fee with leave to amend. Plaintiff was advised to resubmit the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Complaint with a certified copy of the Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization within 30 days, and failure to do so would result in closure of the case #6 . Plaintiff has failed to submit a timely response. Accordingly, the Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees is DENIED and the case is closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Although Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, i.e., without legal representation, he nonetheless is required to comply with Court orders, the Local Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 83-2.2.3. The Local Rules are available on the Court's website, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/court-procedures/ local-rules. The Court cannot provide legal advice to any party, including pro se litigants, i.e., parties who are not represented by a lawyer. There is a free "Pro Se Clinic" that can provide information and guidance about many aspects of civil litigation in this Court. The Court notes that a party to this lawsuit does not have a lawyer. Parties in court without a lawyer are called "pro se litigants." These parties often face special challenges in federal court. Public Counsel runs a free Federal Pro Se Clinic where pro se litigants can get information and guidance. The Clinic is located at the Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 (note that the clinic may not be open for in-person appointments during the pandemic). Pro se litigants must call or submit an on-line application to request services as follows: on-line applications can be submitted at http://prose.cacd.uscourts.gov/los-angeles, or call (213) 385-2977, ext. 270. Pro se litigants may submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerks Office. Only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Documents are submitted in PDF format through an online portal on the Court's website. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. Attorneys are required by the local rules to file documents electronically using the Courts CM/ECF System. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: denying re APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . IT IS FURTHER ORDER that: Plaintiff shall pay the filing fees or file an amended application within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. [See document for details.] (et) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by plaintiff Alfred Fant. (ghap) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Experian.Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Alfred Fant. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Experian) (ghap) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian is a litigant