This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:34:34 (UTC).

Alexsam, Inc. v. US Bank NA

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Alexsam, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against US Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexsam, Inc.

Defendant

US Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy C Davis

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC - Alabama

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35202

Travis E. Lynch

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis LLC - Atlanta

3621 Vinings Slopesuite 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

Walter Lee Gresham, III

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC - Alabama

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35202

William Joseph Cornelius, Jr

Attorney at Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

One American Center

909 Ese Loop 323, SU 400

Jacqueline K Burt

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis LLC - Atlanta

3621 Vinings Slopesuite 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

Jonathan R Miller

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis LLC - Atlanta

3621 Vinings Slopesuite 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

Mark R Ekonen

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC - Alabama

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35202

Steven Whitefield Ritcheson

Attorney at Insight, A Professional Law Corporation

9800D Topanga Canyon Blvd., #347

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Defendant Attorneys

Marlee R Hartenstein

Attorney at Jones Day - Pittsburgh PA

One Mellon Center500 Grant St

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

John Thomas Vitt

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Joshua Taylor

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Sanjiv Prakash Laud

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 1:21-cv-00588, filed 09/13/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to the Southern District of Ohio. (klc, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by US Bank NA.(Laud, Sanjiv) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against US Bank NA, filed by Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ch, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER - Court SEVERS all claims asserted by Plaintiff AlexSam, Inc. against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association and directs the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER the same to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1406(a).4 (THIS CASE WAS SEVERED FROM CASE 2:19-CV-331). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/19/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AlexSam is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Thomas Vitt