This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:18:02 (UTC).

Alexsam, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Alexsam, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alvin K. Hellerstein and Paul A. Crotty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08116

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Alvin K. Hellerstein

Paul A. Crotty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Alexsam, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Robert Miller

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

3621 Vinings Slope, Suite 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

Taylor Christopher Bartlett

Attorney at Henderson & Brennan

222 Mamaroneck Avenue

White Plains, NY 10605

Timothy C. Davis

Attorney at Henderson & Brennan

222 Mamaroneck Avenue

White Plains, NY 10605

William Joseph Cornelius, Jr

Attorney at Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

One American Center

909 Ese Loop 323, SU 400

Jacqueline K Burt

Attorney at Heninger Garrison Davis LLC - Atlanta

3621 Vinings Slope, Suite 4320

Atlanta, GA 30339

Timothy C Davis

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35202

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Lewis V. Popovski

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Lupco (Lewis) V Popovski

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Roger Brian Craft

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Ryan Joseph Sheehan

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Express Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc., American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.. Document filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Popovski, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#16

(#16) FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Express Company for American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc., American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.. Document filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Popovski, Lewis) Modified on 10/18/2021 (ldi). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Joseph Sheehan on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Sheehan, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis V. Popovski on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Popovski, Lewis) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#13

(#13) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Answer To Counterclaims Out Of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jonathan R. Miller dated October 14, 2021. Document filed by Alexsam, Inc...(Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim. Document filed by Alexsam, Inc...(Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan R. Miller

9 #9

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Supplement

2 #1

Supplement

2 #2

Main Document

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Express Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc., American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.. Document filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Popovski, Lewis) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lewis V. Popovski to RE-FILE Document #16 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Express Company for American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc., American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.. Document filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Popovski, Lewis) Modified on 10/18/2021 (ldi). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Joseph Sheehan on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Sheehan, Ryan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis V. Popovski on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc...(Popovski, Lewis) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Answer To Counterclaims Out Of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jonathan R. Miller dated October 14, 2021. Document filed by Alexsam, Inc...(Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim. Document filed by Alexsam, Inc...(Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jonathan R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Christopher Bartlett on behalf of Alexsam, Inc...(Bartlett, Taylor) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Eastern; Case Number: 2:21-cv-00347. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy C Davis on behalf of Alexsam, Inc. (Davis, Timothy) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline K Burt on behalf of Alexsam, Inc. (Burt, Jacqueline) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan R Miller on behalf of Alexsam, Inc. (Miller, Jonathan) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint (Third), COUNTERCLAIM against Alexsam, Inc. by American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc.(Findlay, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. PLEASE SEE DKT #4 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint (klc, ) Modified on 9/22/2021 (klc, ). Modified on 9/22/2021 (klc, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER TO TRANSFER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/03/2021. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 9/30/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AlexSam is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Travel Related Svcs Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis V. Popovski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lupco (Lewis) V Popovski