This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 08:22:34 (UTC).

Alexis v. The State of Illinois System of Employment under S-O-R et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Alexis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The State of Illinois System of Employment under S-O-R. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05536

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ballard Alexis

Defendants

The State of Illinois System of Employment under S-O-R

Illinois State Police

Chicago Police Dept.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Alexander

Attorney at Mirabella, Kincaid, Frederick & Mirabella, LLC

1737 South Naperville Road, Suite 100

Wheaton, IL 60189

Russell W. Hartigan

Attorney at Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec and Hoff, Ltd

The Prairie Building, 835 Mcclintock Drive, Second Floor

Burr Ridge, IL 60527-0860

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Attorney for Ballard Alexis added. The Court recruits Attorney Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Alexander, 1737 South Naperville Road, Suite 100, Wheaton, IL 60189, (630) 665-7300,as counsel for Plaintiff Ballard Alexis. Status hearing set for 12/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall attempt to contact Plaintiff at 312-852-7106. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw #13 is granted. Attorney Russell Hartigan is relieved from his assignment as recruited counsel and is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney Russell Hartigan shall be returned to the pro bono panel for a new assignment. The Court will recruit new counsel to represent the Plaintiff. Motion hearing set for 10/23/2020 #13 is stricken. The status hearing set for 10/23/2020 #8 is stricken and re-set for 12/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Russell W. Hartigan for presentment of motion to withdraw #13 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/23/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

13 #2

Exhibit 2

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis to withdraw as Retained Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to reassign case #10 is denied without prejudice. If counsel renews his motion, he should provide some explanation as to why his current professional status and plans are inconsistent with his acting as recruited counsel in this case. See L.R. 83.38. Alternatively, counsel may move to withdraw from the trial bar. Motion hearing set for 9/25/2020 #11 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Russell W. Hartigan for presentment of motion to reassign case #10 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/25/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis to reassign case (Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#9

(#9) COMPLAINT filed by Ballard Alexis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Motion for attorney representation #5 is granted. The Court recruits Attorney Russell W. Hartigan of Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec and Hoff, LTD., The Prairie Building, 835 McClintock Drive, Burr Ridge, Illinois, 60527-0860, (630) 655-6000 extension 245,as counsel for Plaintiff Ballard Alexis. Status hearing set for 10/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall attempt to contact Plaintiff at 312-852-7106. Summonses will not issue at this time. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis for attorney representation (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Ballard Alexis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Attorney for Ballard Alexis added. The Court recruits Attorney Jolianne Stacey-Leigh Alexander, 1737 South Naperville Road, Suite 100, Wheaton, IL 60189, (630) 665-7300,as counsel for Plaintiff Ballard Alexis. Status hearing set for 12/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall attempt to contact Plaintiff at 312-852-7106. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to withdraw #13 is granted. Attorney Russell Hartigan is relieved from his assignment as recruited counsel and is terminated as counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney Russell Hartigan shall be returned to the pro bono panel for a new assignment. The Court will recruit new counsel to represent the Plaintiff. Motion hearing set for 10/23/2020 #13 is stricken. The status hearing set for 10/23/2020 #8 is stricken and re-set for 12/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion by Russell W. Hartigan for presentment of motion to withdraw #13 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/23/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis to withdraw as Retained Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to reassign case #10 is denied without prejudice. If counsel renews his motion, he should provide some explanation as to why his current professional status and plans are inconsistent with his acting as recruited counsel in this case. See L.R. 83.38. Alternatively, counsel may move to withdraw from the trial bar. Motion hearing set for 9/25/2020 #11 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Russell W. Hartigan for presentment of motion to reassign case #10 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/25/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis to reassign case (Hartigan, Russell) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COMPLAINT filed by Ballard Alexis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Motion for attorney representation #5 is granted. The Court recruits Attorney Russell W. Hartigan of Goldstine, Skrodzki, Russian, Nemec and Hoff, LTD., The Prairie Building, 835 McClintock Drive, Burr Ridge, Illinois, 60527-0860, (630) 655-6000 extension 245,as counsel for Plaintiff Ballard Alexis. Status hearing set for 10/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall attempt to contact Plaintiff at 312-852-7106. Summonses will not issue at this time. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis for attorney representation (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ballard Alexis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Ballard Alexis (sxb, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jolianne S. Alexander