Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2020 at 10:15:43 (UTC).

Alexis, et al v. Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 Alexis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cognizant Technology Solutions U S Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher P. Tuite and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01170

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ronald Rosales

Fabiola Alexis

Defendants

Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation

Maria Blanchard

Cognizant Business Services Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathryn Comly Hopkinson

Attorney at Thompson Legal Center, LLC

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 245

Tampa, FL 33602-5744

James Moten Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Legal Center, LLC

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 245

Tampa, FL 33602-5744

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Ray Espino Reynolds

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

Suite 5300, 200 South Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131

Matthew A. Russell

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 West Wacker Drive., Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

Sari M. Alamuddin

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

5Th Floor, 77 W Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60601

Anna K. Perocchi

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

77 W. Wacker Dr., Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER re #20--mediation report; dismissing the action; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/8/2020. (BK) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#20

(#20) MEDIATION report Hearing held on June 24, 2020. Hearing outcome: Settled. (Munoz, Shane) Modified on 7/2/2020 (DG). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18--motion for an extension of time; extending through 7/22/2020 the time within which Cognizant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/11/2020. (BK) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#18

(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint (6-9-2020) Pending Private Mediation by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER re #14--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/29/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hopkinson, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sari M. Alamuddin; granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anna K. Perocchi; granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew A. Russell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/21/2020. (AHA) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #3

State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1B

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit 1A

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re #20--mediation report; dismissing the action; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/8/2020. (BK) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEDIATION report Hearing held on June 24, 2020. Hearing outcome: Settled. (Munoz, Shane) Modified on 7/2/2020 (DG). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18--motion for an extension of time; extending through 7/22/2020 the time within which Cognizant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/11/2020. (BK) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint (6-9-2020) Pending Private Mediation by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #14--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/29/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hopkinson, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11--motion to amend the complaint to substitute Cognizant Technology Solutions US Corporation for Cognizant Business Services Corporation; amended complaint due 5/29/2020; directing the clerk to AMEND the case caption in accord with the amended complaint; granting #9--motion for an extension of time; extending through 6/22/2020 the time within which the defendants must respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/26/2020. (BK) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sari M. Alamuddin; granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anna K. Perocchi; granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew A. Russell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/21/2020. (AHA) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Matthew A. Russell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836446 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Anna K. Perocchi to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836412 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Sari M. Alamuddin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836376 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to counsel Sari M. Alamuddin of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Matthew A. Russell of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to counsel Anna K. Perocchi of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1170-T-23CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Cognizant Business Services Corporation At the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 20-CA-003459 filed in State Court on 04/20/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16833424 filed by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit 1A, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Modified on 5/21/2020 (TDC). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cognizant Technology Solutions India Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Comly Hopkinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James M Thompson