This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2020 at 07:47:27 (UTC).

Alexandrowski v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 Alexandrowski filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas M. Parker and Jeffrey J. Helmick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02302

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas M. Parker

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tonya M Alexandrowski

Tonya M. Alexandrowski

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randal S. Forbes

Attorney at Forbes Rodman

P.O. Box 374

Angola, IN 46703

Jason S. Rodman

Attorney at Forbes Rodman

312 North Wayne Street, P.O. Box 374

Angola, IN 46703

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration - Chicago

Ruchi Vikram Asher

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland - Social Security

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/14/2020. (D,JJ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/13/20. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Commissioner's #11 Motion for extension of time until February 15, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint and file the administrative record. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 12/9/2020. (D,JJ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion for extension of time until February 15, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Rasputnis, #2 Proposed Order)(Asher, Ruchi) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the United States Attorney on 10/16/2020; by FedEx upon the Social Security Administration on 10/20/2020 (signed C-19); and by FedEx upon the United States Attorney General on 10/19/2020 (signed C-19) filed on behalf of Tonya M. Alexandrowski Related document(s) #8 . (J,FE) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Supplement - Certificate of Compliance, filed by Tonya M Alexandrowski. (Forbes, Randal) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Magistrate Consent Package issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285). (D,JJ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/14/2020. (D,JJ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/14/2020. (D,JJ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/13/20. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 10/13/20. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Jason S. Rodman filed by on behalf of Tonya M Alexandrowski. (Rodman, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Appearance by Randal S. Forbes filed by on behalf of Tonya M Alexandrowski. (Forbes, Randal) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Tonya M Alexandrowski. (Forbes, Randal) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Tonya M Alexandrowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285) (Forbes, Randal) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less