This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 08:00:32 (UTC).

Alexander v. Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Alexander filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Alexander

Defendant

Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Robert Sessums

Attorney at FUNDERBURG, SESSUMS & PETERSON

P. O. Box 13960, 901 N. State Street (39202)

Jackson, MS 39236-3960

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Jarrad Garner

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE, LLP - Ridgeland

1018 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 800

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Darryl A. Wilson

Attorney at ADAMS AND REESE, LLP - Ridgeland

1018 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 800

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure by Kimberly Alexander (Sessums, Craig) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#9

(#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT DETAILING RESIDENCY OF MEMBERS by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#5

(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC Volumes 1 (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER on Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 1/24/2019. (DJ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl A. Wilson on behalf of Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC.(Garner, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC from Circuit Court of Warren County, Mississippi, case number 19,0001-CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3896273) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure by Kimberly Alexander (Sessums, Craig) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT DETAILING RESIDENCY OF MEMBERS by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted. Personal addresses are unnecessary for purposes of subject matter jurisdiction. The defendant only needs to file an affidavit detailing the state residency of each of its members. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 2/1/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (DJ) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) State Court Record by Defendant Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC Volumes 1 (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER on Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 1/24/2019. (DJ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl A. Wilson on behalf of Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC (Wilson, Darryl) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC.(Garner, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vicksburg Battlefield Hotel, LLC from Circuit Court of Warren County, Mississippi, case number 19,0001-CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3896273) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.