This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:27:11 (UTC).

Alexander v. Small

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Alexander filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Small. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fredrick Dewayne Alexander

Mobile, AL 36601

Defendant

Jarred Small

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plaintiff's action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute this action as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/29/20. (skb) (Copy to Plaintiff on 9/29/20) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Order directing payment of partial filing fee re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to REMIT $15.00 by 9/11/2020. If filing fee is paid, Clerk is DIRECTED to forward this action as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 08/19/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fredrick Dewayne Alexander. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#1

(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Jarred Small filed by Fredrick Dewayne Alexander. Referred to MJ/Murray (PSU). (skb) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plaintiff's action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute this action as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/29/20. (skb) (Copy to Plaintiff on 9/29/20) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order directing payment of partial filing fee re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to REMIT $15.00 by 9/11/2020. If filing fee is paid, Clerk is DIRECTED to forward this action as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 08/19/2020. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fredrick Dewayne Alexander. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Jarred Small filed by Fredrick Dewayne Alexander. Referred to MJ/Murray (PSU). (skb) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less