This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 08:08:13 (UTC).

Alexander v. Safeway Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Alexander filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Safeway Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00365

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur W. Alexander, Jr.

Defendants

Safeway Inc.

John Does 1-10

Jane Does 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Doe Corporations 1-10

Doe Governmental Entities 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael C. Lippert

Attorney at American Savings Bank Tower

1001 Bishop Street, Suite 2828

Honolulu, HI 96813

George Cesar Alejandro

Palm Wave Building

1260 Young Street, SU 228

Defendant Attorneys

Normand R. Lezy

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael J. Nakano

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Shawn L.M. Benton

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #2

Clerk's Certificate

5 #1

Case Detail Docket List

#5

#4

3 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

#3

1 #2

Exhibit B

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur W. Alexander, Jr Rule 26(a)(1) Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Alejandro, George) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Return of Service on Subpoena Queen's Medical Center was served on 10/04/2021 (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safeway Inc. (Notice of Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories-QMC) (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 9/27/2021. (jo) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Mr. Alejandro reported Plaintiff's condition stable. Parties amenable to early settlement discussions after required discovery.Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 2/18/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code 2070326.Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 9/19/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by 9/12/2022 to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov.Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 2/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/20/2022. Discovery due by 10/21/2022. (ATT / 9:20 - 9:25 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur W. Alexander, Jr Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents (Alejandro, George) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safeway Inc. (First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Scheduling Conference Statement by Safeway Inc.. (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Alejandro, George) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of the Rule 26(f) Conference of the Parties. (Alejandro, George) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by George Cesar Alejandro on behalf of Arthur W. Alexander, Jr on behalf of Arthur W. Alexander, Jr. (Alejandro, George) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, Case 1CCV-21-0000107 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (jni) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeway Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, LLC for Safeway Inc... (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/27/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00365 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeway Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-21-0000107. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2571924), filed by Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint; Summons - 1CCV-21-0000107) , #2 Exhibit B (Defendant Safeway Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service - 1CCV-21-0000107) , #3 Certificate of Service)(Benton, Shawn) Modified on 8/27/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn L.M. Benton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Normand R. Lezy