This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:43:16 (UTC).

Alexander v. Patel et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Alexander filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Patel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James P. Jones and Pamela Meade Sargent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James P. Jones

Referral Judge

Pamela Meade Sargent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glenna Alexander

Defendants

Ashaben Patel

Kartik Patel

Kartik Patel doing business as Country Boys Food Mart

Ashaben Patel doing business as Country Boys Food Mart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Emory Large

Attorney at LARGE & ASSOCIATES

529 Alabama Street

Bristol, TN 37620

Defendant Attorney

William Bradford Stallard

Attorney at Penn Stuart & Eskridge

P.O. Box 2288

Abingdon, VA 24212-2288

 

Court Documents

13 #4

Exhibit #4

13 #3

Exhibit #3

13 #2

Exhibit #2

13 #1

Exhibit #1

#13

(#13) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties . filed by Glenna Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4)(Large, Michael)

#12

(#12) Order to Respond; Plaintiff must file within 14 days a memorandum setting forth the justification for the addition of the proposed parties; Plt's response due by 1/27/2020; Defendants may file a response to the plaintiff's memorandum within 14 days. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/13/20. (flc)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties by Glenna Alexander. (Large, Michael) Modified on 1/9/2020 - Removed text referring motion to Judge Sargent (ejs).

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 & 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/12/19. (ejs)

#7

(#7) Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel (Stallard, William)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel (Stallard, William)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2019 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (flc)

#3

(#3) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashaben Patel (flc)

#2

(#2) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kartik Patel (flc)

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Second Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Original Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bristol City Circuit Court, case number CL19000371. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt #: 0423-3276786), filed by Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(flc)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties . filed by Glenna Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4)(Large, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Order to Respond; Plaintiff must file within 14 days a memorandum setting forth the justification for the addition of the proposed parties; Plt's response due by 1/27/2020; Defendants may file a response to the plaintiff's memorandum within 14 days. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/13/20. (flc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties by Glenna Alexander. (Large, Michael) Modified on 1/9/2020 - Removed text referring motion to Judge Sargent (ejs).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 & 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 & 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/12/19. (ejs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • (#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Large and Stallard on 12/11/2019. Jury trial set for 11/2-3/20 before J. Jones in Abingdon. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel (Stallard, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel (Stallard, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2019 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (flc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashaben Patel (flc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kartik Patel (flc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bristol City Circuit Court, case number CL19000371. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt #: 0423-3276786), filed by Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(flc)

    Read MoreRead Less