This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:05:57 (UTC).

Alexander v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Alexander filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leo I. Brisbois and Joan N. Ericksen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00943

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judge

Joan N. Ericksen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darnell Alexander

Stillwater, MN 55082

Defendants

John Doe

Correctional officials

Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darnell Alexander. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/16/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER Plaintiff Darnell Alexander must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $36.15 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If Alexander fails to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/1/2019. (JLB) cc: Darnell Alexander. Modified text on 7/2/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Correctional officials, John Doe, Medical Staff filed by Darnell Alexander. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (kt)cc: Alexander. (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #4 Cover Letter) (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 4/16/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Plaintiff Darnell Alexander must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $36.15 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If Alexander fails to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/1/2019. (JLB) cc: Darnell Alexander. Modified text on 7/2/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darnell Alexander. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/16/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Correctional officials, John Doe, Medical Staff filed by Darnell Alexander. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope) (kt)cc: Alexander. (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #4 Cover Letter) (kt). Document QC'd by KMH on 4/16/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.