This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2022 at 09:47:37 (UTC).

Alexander v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Alexander filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Travelers Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02177

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josephine Alexander

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendants

Pharmacia LLC

Wyeth LLC

Bunge North America, Inc.

Tidewater Inc

OC Oil & Refining Corporation

CBS Corporation doing business as Paramount Global formerly known as ViacomCBS Inc formerly known as CBS Corporation formerly known as Viacom Inc formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Travelers Indemnity Company

Chevron USA Inc

Monsanto Company

Shell Oil Company

Texaco Inc

Dow Chemical

Union Carbide

Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.

Wyeth Inc

Wyeth Holdings, LLC

Wyeth Holdings Corporation

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickey P. Landry

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Frank J. Swarr

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Matthew C. Clark

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Defendant Attorneys

Kelsey Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Magali Ann Puente-Martin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Roth Martin Hainkel

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras, Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Kelly L. Long

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Charles B. Wilmore

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Neil Charles Abramson

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Nicholas Simon

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Elizabeth S. Wheeler

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Erin Conner Percy

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Other Attorneys

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Edward J. Lassus, Jr.

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Gabriel J. Veninata

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) ORDER & REASONS denying #7 Motion to Remand to State Court for the reasons set forth in document. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/2/2022. (mm) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

16 #2

Exhibit

16 #1

Exhibit

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/23/2022. (am) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

14 #4

Exhibit

14 #3

Exhibit

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

7 #6

Proposed Order

7 #5

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

7 #4

Exhibit

7 #3

Exhibit

7 #2

Exhibit

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

7 #7

Main Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Rule 41(A) Dismissal as to Century Indemnity Company, as successor to CCI Insurance Company, as successor to Insurance Company of North America and Pacific Employers Insurance Company, as the insurers for Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. by Josephine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landry, Mickey) Modified text on 9/8/2022 (clc). (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER & REASONS denying #7 Motion to Remand to State Court for the reasons set forth in document. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/2/2022. (mm) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Josephine Alexander re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(am) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/23/2022. (am) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Josephine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F)(Garner, James) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: : IT IS ORDERED that the motion #11 is GRANTED, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/15/2022.(am) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, to File Responsive Pleadings Pending Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text on 8/15/2022 (am). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, to File Responsive Pleadings Pending Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text on 8/12/2022 (am). (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #8 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/09/2022. (am) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by Josephine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Josephine Alexander. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal,, as to Century Indemnity Company answer due 8/11/2022; Pacific Employers Insurance Company answer due 8/11/2022. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 07/25/2022. (am) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Facts by Josephine Alexander Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(e)(3) (Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer /File Responsive Pleadings to #1 Notice of Removal by Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James) Modified text on 7/25/2022 (lw). (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Collateral Proceeding. (Garner, James) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 29th Judicial District Court (St. Charles), case number 90517 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9446930) filed by Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James M. Garner added to party Century Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney James M. Garner added to party Pacific Employers Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Garner, James) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tidewater, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bunge North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Entergy Louisiana, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant