This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:59:42 (UTC).

Alexander Stross v. The Microsoft Network, LLC et al

Case Summary

On September 24, 2021, Alexander Stross (“Stross'' or “Plaintiff”), represented by Benjamin Firestone Tookey and Stephen M. Doniger of Doniger Burroughs APC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against The Microsoft Network, LLC (“MSN”) and DOES 1 through 10 (collectively, “DOE Defendants'') (altogether with MSN, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages along with prejudgment interest for the alleged infringement of United States Copyright owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judges R. Gary Klausner and Pedro V. Castillo presiding.

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Copyright i.e., the six original (the “Subject Photographs”), owned by the plaintiff.

In the complaint the plaintiff alleged that, “Following the publication and display of the Subject Photographs, MSN, DOE Defendants, and each of them used the Subject Photographs without Plaintiff’s authorization for commercial purposes in various ways, including on MSN’s website www.msn.com (the “Accused Posts”). Upon information and belief, Defendants, and each of them, had access to the Subject Photographs, including through Plaintiff’s website and social media accounts, Internet search engines, or third-party websites.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “That Defendants, and each of them, infringed Plaintiff’s copyrights in and to the Subject Photographs by copying, storing, displaying, reproducing, transmitting, distributing, publishing, and/or otherwise using the Subject Photographs on MSN’s website without a license or Plaintiff’s authorization or consent. Due to Defendants’, and each of their, acts of copyright infringement. Plaintiff has suffered damages.”

The plaintiff also alleged that, “Due to Defendants’, and each of their, acts of copyright infringement, Defendants, and each of them, have obtained profits they would not have realized but for their infringement of the Subject Photographs. Upon information and belief, Plaintiff alleges that Defendants, and each of them, committed the foregoing acts of copyright infringement willfully, intentionally, maliciously, or with reckless disregard for Plaintiff’s rights in the Subject Photographs.”

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the plaintiff which deals with the alleged infringement of Copyright owned by the plaintiff.

In its prayer for relief the plaintiff has requested the court that the defendants—each of them—their respective agents, and anyone acting in concert with the defendants or their agents, be enjoined from copying, storing, displaying, reproducing, transmitting, distributing, publishing, and/or otherwise using the Subject Photographs without a license or the plaintiff’s authorization or consent. The plaintiff requested an order requiring the defendants, and each of them, to remove the Subject Photographs from MSN’s website and all other websites and/or servers that MSN owns and/or operates. Further, the plaintiff requested to be awarded all profits attributable to the defendants’ and each of their acts of copyright infringement plus all losses of the plaintiff or alternatively, statutory damages as available under 17 U.S.C. § 504. The plaintiff requested to be awarded its attorneys’ fees as available under 17 U.S.C. § 505 along with pre-judgment interest as allowed by law and the costs of this action along with such further legal and equitable relief as the court deems proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07634

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander Stross

Defendants

The Microsoft Network, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company, individually doing business as MSN

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Firestone Tookey

Stephen M. Doniger

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-07634 VAP(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Microsoft Network, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross, identifying THE MICROSOFT NETWORK, LLC. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32042957 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Alexander Stross(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less