This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2020 at 08:12:50 (UTC).

Alexander et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Alexander filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aaron Gallick

Robert Nerem

Jeffrey Postma

Ryan Divis

Colby Till

Daniel May

James Cortese

Zachary Hauser

Nathan Wittenstein

Mark Hersom

Steve Kury

Thomas Caleb Bell

Rodney Bell

Olivia Kaplan

Felix Vanderbrink

Peter Gildea

Tyler Alexander

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Wells Fargo & Company Salary Continuation Pay Plan

Wells Fargo & Company

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Graham Gamble

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Wesley T. Graham

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Elissa M. Holman

Attorney at DUNCAN GREEN PC

400 Locust St, Suite 380

Des Moines, IA 50309-2331

Defendant Attorney

Patrick R. Martin

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART PC (MN)

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 1800

Minneapols, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo & Company Salary Continuation Pay Plan, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Martin on behalf of All Defendants (Martin, Patrick) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by all plaintiffs; Wells Fargo & Company Salary Continuation Pay Plan waiver served on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Graham, Wesley) Modified on 3/9/2020 removed all individual plaintiffs names (slg). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by all plaintiffs; Wells Fargo & Company waiver served on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Graham, Wesley) Modified on 3/9/2020 removed all individual plaintiffs names(slg). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by all plaintiffs; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver served on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Graham, Wesley) Modified on 3/9/2020 removed all individual plaintiffs names (slg). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elissa M. Holman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holman, Elissa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Graham Gamble on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gamble, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo & Company Salary Continuation Pay Plan, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4055469., filed by Zachary Hauser, Felix Vanderbrink, James Cortese, Jeffrey Postma, Thomas Caleb Bell, Nathan Wittenstein, Tyler Alexander, Timothy Sinnwell, Isaac Young, Robert Nerem, Olivia Kaplan, Bryan Carr, Rodney Bell, Aaron Gallick, Mark Hersom, Colby Till, Steve Kury, Daniel May, Ryan Divis, Dillon Budde, David Stockwell, Peter Gildea, Robert Carpenter. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/11/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/11/2020.(Graham, Wesley) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick R Martin