This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 09:20:06 (UTC).

Alexander et al v. Dresser L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Alexander filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Dresser L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Joseph and Joseph H L Perez-Montes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Joseph

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elray DuBois

New Orleans, LA 70130

Elizabeth Alexander

New Orleans, LA 70130

Fred Alexander

New Orleans, LA 70130

Robert Foy

New Orleans, LA 70130

Chalong Breimal

New Orleans, LA 70130

Julia Glenn

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendants

Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC

GE Oil and Gas, Inc.

Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.

Baker Hughes, Inc.

General Electric Company

Derek Descant

EHHC NewCo, LLC

Dresser RE LLC

Baker Hughes Holdings LLC

Dresser, LLC

Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality

CFC Holdings, Inc.

GE Oil and Gas LLC

GE Oil and Gas US Holdings I, Inc.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence J Centola, III

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Scott R Bickford

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Thomas B Wahlder

1740 Jackson St

Alexandria, LA 71301

Jason Z Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephen John Hecker

Attorney at Hecker Law Firm

631 St Charles Ave Ste 2F

New Orleans, LA 70130

Neil Franz Nazareth

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M Stakelum

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Robert J Burvant

Attorney at King & Jurgens

201 St Charles Ave Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170-1034

Michael J Cerniglia

Attorney at King & Jurgens

201 St Charles Ave Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170-1034

Eric E Jarrell

Attorney at King & Jurgens

201 St Charles Ave Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170-1034

Other Attorneys

J Scott Janoe

Attorney at Baker Botts (HOU)

910 Louisiana St 37Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin

Attorney at Baker Botts (HOU)

910 Louisiana St 37Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Mitchell Blake Bryant

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Marjorie A McKeithen

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Lauren Courtney Mastio

Attorney at Jones Walker (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Tracie Jo Renfroe

Attorney at King & Spalding (HOU)

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Meghan Elizabeth Smith

Attorney at Curry & Friend (NO)

228 St Charles Ave Ste 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Charles S Weems, III

Attorney at Gold Weems et al

P O Box 6118

Alexandria, LA 71307-6118

Stephen A LaFleur

Attorney at Gold Weems et al

P O Box 6118

Alexandria, LA 71307-6118

Tiffany Nicole Dupree

Attorney at Jones Walker (BR)

445 N Blvd Ste 800

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

31 #2

Proposed order

30 #2

Proposed order

30 #1

Exhibit A

#30

29 #2

Proposed order

29 #1

Exhibit A

#29

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mitchell Blake Bryant for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tracie Jo Renfroe for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Craig Andrew Stanfield for Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/19/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #21 Motion to Dismiss, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Motion to Dismiss & #24 Motion to Dismiss with consent. Motions referred to Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #21 Motion to Dismiss, #22 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Motion to Dismiss & #24 Motion to Dismiss with consent by Elizabeth Alexander, Fred Alexander, Chalong Breimal, Elray DuBois, Robert Foy, Julia Glenn, Iris Starks. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Landry, Jason) Modified on 3/19/2021 to modify motion event, docket text and create docket entry relationships. (Crick, S). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Reply to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Elizabeth Alexander, Fred Alexander. (aty,Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 3/16/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Craig A. Stanfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608565) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Tracie Jo Renfroe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608555) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Mitchell B. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4608530) by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings L L C, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE ENTRY: A STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 03/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via video teleconference before Mag. Judge Perez-Montes. All attendance at this hearing will be by video conference. An email with the access link will be sent the day prior to the hearing. All counsel of record are responsible for sharing access information with represented parties, witnesses, or other persons associated with parties or witnesses that wish to attend. Participants are reminded of requirements of our local rules with respect to proper attire in the courtroom. They are to abide by those requirements even when participating via teleconference. Compliance Deadline set for 3/22/2021. The public is welcome to participate via video conference and may send an email request to JPM_VTC@lawd.uscourts.gov to request access information. The access will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Those who are granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanction deemed necessary by the Court. The public is also reminded that silence must be observed by all audience members and any public outbursts will be met with immediate removal of video and audio feed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/12/2021. (crt,Tice, Y) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Smith, Meghan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings Inc, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas Inc, G E Oil & Gas L L C, C F C Holdings L L C identifying Corporate Parents, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, Baker Hughes Co, E H H C NewCo L L C, Dresser L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Energy Services L L C, G E Oil & Gas L L C, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, Baker Hughes Co, E H H C NewCo L L C, G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc, General Electric Co. (Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party G E Oil & Gas Inc(pty:dft), G E Oil & Gas L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,Stakelum, Andrew) Modified on 1/28/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/22/2021. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #4 Consent to Removal sent to Meghan Elizabeth Smith on behalf of G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/5/2021. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/22/2021. (crt,Tice, Y) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO REMOVAL by G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc (Attorney Meghan Elizabeth Smith added to party G E Oil & Gas U S Holdings I Inc(pty:dft)). (aty,Smith, Meghan) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/21/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew M Stakelum on behalf of Baker Hughes Co, Baker Hughes Holdings L L C, Baker Hughes Inc, Baker Hughes a G E Co L L C, C F C Holdings Inc, Dresser L L C, Dresser R E L L C, E H H C NewCo L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/4/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketJudge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 9th JDC Parish of Rapides, Case Number 269,709A with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4543358) filed by Baker Hughes, Inc., CFC Holdings, Inc., Baker Hughes Company, Dresser RE LLC, Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC, Dresser, LLC, EHHC NewCo, LLC, Baker Hughes Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes, A GE Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Baker Hughes, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party CFC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser RE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party Dresser, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew M Stakelum added to party EHHC NewCo, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Stakelum, Andrew) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality is a litigant

Latest cases where GE OIL & GAS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED is a litigant