This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2021 at 10:37:41 (UTC).

Aldridge v. JELD-WEN Holding, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Aldridge filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against JELD-WEN Holding, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Aldridge

Defendants

William Banholzer

Gary S. Michel

Suzanne Stefany

Bruce Taten

Mark A. Beck

Anthony Munk

Kirk S. Hachigian

Patrick Tolbert

Steven Wynne

Roderick Wendt

Gregory Maxwell

Matthew Ross

Martha Byorum

L. Brooks Mallard

Nominal Defendant

JELD-WEN Holding, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Klauder

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant and Nominal Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan A. Choa

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Rachel M. Fritzler

Michael A. Pittenger

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Sandra C. Goldstein

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Rachel M. Fritzler and Sandra C. Goldstein for William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, JELD-WEN Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert,Rachel M. Fritzler, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel Fritzler and Sandra C. Goldstein, filed by Mark A. Beck, Suzanne Stefany, Patrick Tolbert, William Banholzer, Gary S. Michel, Roderick Wendt, JELD-WEN Holding, Inc., Kirk S. Hachigian, Bruce Taten, Matthew Ross, Gregory Maxwell, Anthony Munk, Martha Byorum, Steven Wynne, L. Brooks Mallard. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2021. (nms) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel Fritzler and Sandra C. Goldstein - filed by William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, JELD-WEN Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne. (Pittenger, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Choa on behalf of William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, JELD-WEN Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne (Choa, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jason Aldridge: For William Banholzer waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Mark A. Beck waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Martha Byorum waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Kirk S. Hachigian waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; JELD-WEN Holding, Inc. waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; L. Brooks Mallard waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Gregory Maxwell waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Gary S. Michel waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Anthony Munk waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Matthew Ross waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Suzanne Stefany waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Bruce Taten waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Patrick Tolbert waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Roderick Wendt waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021; Steven Wynne waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (sam) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT - filed against William Banholzer, Mark A. Beck, Martha Byorum, Kirk S. Hachigian, JELD-WEN Holding, Inc., L. Brooks Mallard, Gregory Maxwell, Gary S. Michel, Anthony Munk, Matthew Ross, Suzanne Stefany, Bruce Taten, Patrick Tolbert, Roderick Wendt, Steven Wynne - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3503280.) - filed by Jason Aldridge. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Klauder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst