This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2020 at 08:55:15 (UTC).

Aldo U.S., Inc. v. Damco USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Aldo U S , Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Damco USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M. Berman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08309

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M. Berman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aldo U.S., Inc.

Respondent

Damco USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dennis H. Tracey, III

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (NYC)

390 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Logistics Services Agreement effective March 24, 2017

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Final Award

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Damco USA, Inc.. Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration served. Damco USA, Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Damco USA, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard M. Berman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Aldo Group, Inc. for Aldo U.S., Inc.. Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damco USA, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Dennis H. Tracey, III in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Logistics Services Agreement effective March 24, 2017, #2 Exhibit 2 - Final Award).(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21997798).Document filed by Aldo U.S., Inc...(Tracey, Dennis) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMCO USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aldo US Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis H. Tracey, III