This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:44:58 (UTC).

Alcorn v. LM Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Alcorn filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LM Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01420

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caleb A Alcorn

Defendant

LM Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard D. Daly

Attorney at Daly & Black, P.C.

2211 Norfolk Street, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77098

Jonathan Shawn Sar

Attorney at Leventhal Sar LLC

3200 Cherry Creek South Drive, Suite 520

Denver, CO 80209

Sean Bradley Leventhal

Attorney at Leventhal Sar LLC

3200 Cherry Creek South Drive, Suite 520

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/3/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/14/2019. (slibi, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation All parties do not consent.. (White, Holly) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Richard D. Daly added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 06/07/2019. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be desigated as 19-cv-01420-REB. (rvill, ) Modified to correct text on 6/7/2019 (rvill, ). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Spano on behalf of LM Insurance CorporationAttorney Brian John Spano added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, ) Modified on 5/20/2019 (rroge, ) to correct docket. (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon LM Insurance Corporation on 04/11/2019 (rroge, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against LM Insurance Corporation, filed by Caleb A Alcorn.(rroge, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Holly) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LM Insurance Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv30843. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6692609), filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Amended State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Holly) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Amended State Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Summons

1 #6

Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/3/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/14/2019. (slibi, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/13/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation All parties do not consent.. (White, Holly) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Richard D. Daly added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 06/07/2019. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be desigated as 19-cv-01420-REB. (rvill, ) Modified to correct text on 6/7/2019 (rvill, ). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Spano on behalf of LM Insurance CorporationAttorney Brian John Spano added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Spano, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/1/2019. Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #6 ) due by 7/1/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/24/19. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon LM Insurance Corporation on 04/11/2019 (rroge, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, ) Modified on 5/20/2019 (rroge, ) to correct docket. (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against LM Insurance Corporation, filed by Caleb A Alcorn.(rroge, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Holly) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LM Insurance Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv30843. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6692609), filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Amended State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Holly) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.