This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:55:12 (UTC).

Alcon et al v. Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Alcon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01735

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mario Alcon

Geremias Alcon

Secilia Alcon

Maura Alcon

Marleny Alcon

Hugo Alcon

Defendants

Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC

Sean Douglas Ballmerre

Greenwich Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chirag Patel

Attorney at Cuadra & Patel, LLC

Suite 101, 296 S. Culver Street

Lawrenceville, GA 30046

Norman Humberto Cuadra

Attorney at Cuadra & Patel, LLC

Suite 101, 296 S. Culver Street

Lawrenceville, GA 30046

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos Fernandez

Attorney at Freeman, Mathis, & Gary

100 Galleria Pkwy, Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

Matthew F. Boyer

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit B - Greenwich Registration

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Petition for Removal

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 9/29/2022.(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Geremias Alcon, Hugo Alcon, Mario Alcon, Marleny Alcon, Maura Alcon, Secilia Alcon. (Patel, Chirag) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#4

(#4) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11772759. (Boyer, Matthew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company. (Boyer, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court and remanding this case to the State Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 06/06/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#7

(#7) Letter to Gwinnett County State Court regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (ddm) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Gwinnett County State Court re #7 Letter, #6 Order. (ddm) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter to Gwinnett County State Court regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court and remanding this case to the State Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 06/06/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company. (Boyer, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRefund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 6/2/2022 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Approval re #4 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11772759. (Boyer, Matthew) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Geremias Alcon, Hugo Alcon, Mario Alcon, Marleny Alcon, Maura Alcon, Secilia Alcon. (Patel, Chirag) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 9/29/2022.(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Greenwich Insurance Company, Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11772759) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Greenwich Registration, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Petition for Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 5/3/2022 to edit file date(tas). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew F. Boyer