This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2021 at 09:05:48 (UTC).

Alcocer-Sustaita v. Bernal-Contreras et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Alcocer-Sustaita filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bernal-Contreras. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Micaela Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Micaela Alvarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita

Defendants

Ernesto Bernal-Contreras

Sergio Perez-Guerra

Fonovisa Inc

Azteca Records LLC

Humberto Novoa

Lucia Barron

UMG Recordings Inc

Universal Music Group Inc

Universal Music Group Holding Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerardo Arriaga

Attorney at Law Office of Gerardo Arriaga

7417 N. 10Th Street

Mcallen, TX 78504

Defendant Attorneys

Ysmael D. Fonseca

Attorney at Guerra & Sabo, PLLC

10213 N 10Th Street

Mcallen, TX 78504

Charles C Murray

Attorney at Atlas & Hall

818 Pecan

Mcallen, TX 78504

 

Court Documents

#24

23 #2

Proposed Order

23 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of L Barron-Rodriguez

#23

15 #3

Exhibit

15 #2

Exhibit

15 #1

Affidavit

#15

#7

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Affidavit Declaration of Perez

1 #11

Appendix D8

1 #10

Appendix D7

1 #8

Appendix D5

1 #6

Appendix D3

1 #5

Appendix D2

1 #3

Appendix C

1 #2

Appendix B

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY to Response to #15 Amended MOTION to Remand, filed by Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita. (Arriaga, Gerardo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Lucia Barron, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of L Barron-Rodriguez, #2 Proposed Order)(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joint RESPONSE to #15 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Ernesto Bernal-Contreras, Fonovisa Inc, Sergio Perez-Guerra, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music Group Holding Inc, Universal Music Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Fonovisa Inc, Universal Music Group Holding Inc, Universal Music Group Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Strike #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by UMG Recordings Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER re #14 Agreed MOTION for Continuance. (Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 11/5/2021. Initial Conference reset for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez). (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Ernesto Bernal-Contreras, filed.(Fonseca, Ysmael) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Sergio Perez-Guerra, filed.(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Sergio Perez-Guerra, filed.(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended MOTION to Remand by Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Arriaga, Gerardo) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Fonovisa Inc, filed.(Arriaga, Gerardo) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/27/2021) (kanelson, 7). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation)(Arriaga, Gerardo) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita, Fonovisa Inc, Azteca Records LLC, Humberto Novoa, Lucia Barron, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music Group Inc, Universal Music Group Holding Inc filed by Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita.(Arriaga, Gerardo) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Gabriel Alcocer-Sustaita, filed.(Arriaga, Gerardo) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ernesto Bernal-Contreras, filed.(Fonseca, Ysmael) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sergio Perez-Guerra, filed.(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT to Removal by Ernesto Bernal-Contreras, filed.(Fonseca, Ysmael) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 139th Dist. Court, case number C-2829-21-C (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26835271) filed by Sergio Perez-Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D1, #5 Appendix D2, #6 Appendix D3, #7 Appendix D4, #8 Appendix D5, #9 Appendix D6, #10 Appendix D7, #11 Appendix D8, #12 Appendix D9, #13 Affidavit Declaration of Perez, #14 Affidavit Declaration of Bernal, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles C Murray