This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 08:42:44 (UTC).

ALCOA CORPORATION et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 ALCOA CORPORATION filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC

NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC.

ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC.

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC

ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC.

EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY

ARCONIC, INC.

ALCOA FUELS, INC.

REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY

ALCOA CORPORATION

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen R. Neuwirth

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Sami H. Rashid

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Viola Trebicka

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Sami H. Rashid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rashid, Sami) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Viola Trebicka on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Trebicka, Viola) (Entered: 03/22/2020)

37 #1

*Restricted*

#37

(#37) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01261. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#36

(#36) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from District of Columbia. (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#35

(#35) Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#34

(#34) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/20/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management set for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/21/2020. (rgm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#33

(#33) ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Skowron, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Errata re #2 Disclosure Statement, Amended by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correction of errors. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#2

(#4) Errata re #2 Disclosure Statement, Amended by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correction of errors. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5303171), filed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Sami H. Rashid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rashid, Sami) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Viola Trebicka on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Trebicka, Viola) (Entered: 03/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01261. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to District of Columbia. (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from District of Columbia. (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/20/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management set for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/21/2020. (rgm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. (Skowron, Jonathan) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Errata re #2 Disclosure Statement, Amended by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correction of errors. (Soller, Eric) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketJudge William S. Stickman added. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (mao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. Judge William S. Stickman no longer assigned to case. (mao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying ALCOA CORPORATION as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALCOA CORPORATION, ALCOA FUELS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ARCONIC, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY. (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5303171), filed by NORTHWEST ALLOYS, INC., ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA, LLC, INTALCO ALUMINUM, LLC, ALCOA FUELS, INC., EASTALCO ALUMINUM COMPANY, ALCOA CORPORATION, ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC., ALCOA POWER GENERATING, INC., REYNOLDS METAL COMPANY, ARCONIC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (jjg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 2/12/2020.] (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALUMAX MILL PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where REYNOLDS METALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALCOA INC is a litigant