This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 07:25:28 (UTC).

Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union v. Sonic Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Sonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James S. Gwin (MDL 2807). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-SB-55000

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Gwin (MDL 2807)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Sonic Franchising LLC

Sonic Capital LLC

Sonic Industries Services Inc

Sonic Industries LLC

Sonic Restaurants, Inc.

Sonic Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen Sharp Halbert

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

Stephanie Egner Smith

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

Michael L. Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

Defendant Attorney

Kevin A. Crass

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark

400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3493

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Admission

16 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#16

(#16) Motion for attorney William R. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 14660115779. Filed by Plaintiff Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Admission)(Y,A) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arkansas Eastern. Case number 4:18-cv-00770. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#14

(#14) TRANSFER ORDER in re: Sonic Corp. Customer Data Security Breach Litigation as part of MDL No. 2807 in the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Chair of the Panel Sarah S. Vance. (jak) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 06/06/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order for Unopposed Motion to Extend Rule 26(F) Conference Deadline

#11

(#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Extend Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Unopposed Motion to Extend Rule 26(F) Conference Deadline)(Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Rule 26(F) Conference Deadline by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order

8 #2

Exhibit Notice of Tag-Along Action

8 #1

Exhibit Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corporation, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Notice of Tag-Along Action, #3 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order)(Crass, Kevin) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/15/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/29/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/13/19. (lp) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corporation, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc (Crass, Kevin) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Crass on behalf of Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corporation, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc (Crass, Kevin) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union. (Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union Regarding Waiver of the Service of Summons (Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 01/04/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Motion for attorney William R. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 14660115779. Filed by Plaintiff Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Admission)(Y,A) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arkansas Eastern. Case number 4:18-cv-00770. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TRANSFER ORDER in re: Sonic Corp. Customer Data Security Breach Litigation as part of MDL No. 2807 in the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Chair of the Panel Sarah S. Vance. (jak) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 motion to stay. The Rule 26(f) conference and Rule 26(f) report deadlines are stayed until the JPML issues its final ruling on the transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 05/15/2019. (sed) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 05/15/2019. (sed) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Extend Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Unopposed Motion to Extend Rule 26(F) Conference Deadline)(Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Stay Rule 26(F) Conference Deadline by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time. The defendants' answer to the class action complaint is extended to 14 days after the date on which the JPML issues its final ruling on the issue of transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/18/19. (lp) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corporation, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Notice of Tag-Along Action, #3 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order)(Crass, Kevin) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/15/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/29/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 4/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/13/19. (lp) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 motion to extend time to answer. Defendants' answer is due by March 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 02/27/2019. (sed) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corporation, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc (Crass, Kevin) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Crass on behalf of Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corporation, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Industries Services Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc (Crass, Kevin) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union. (Smith, Stephanie) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union Regarding Waiver of the Service of Summons (Halbert, Karen) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT-CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand filed by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069247. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) [Transferred from ared on 6/6/2019.] (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonic Franchising LLC is a litigant