This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:42:38 (UTC).

Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union v. Fair Isaac Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Fair Isaac Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02559

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Fair Isaac Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Michael Vanek

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C.

55 W. Monroe St., Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Paul Ethan Slater

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, P.C.

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Matthew T. Slater

Attorney at Sperling & Slater, PC

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Michael G Dickler

Attorney at Sperling & Slater

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Michael L. Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

Karen Halbert

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

20 Rahling Circle

Little Rock, AR 72223

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-8718

Bart D. Cohen

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

J. Gregory Deis

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 S. Wacker

Chicago, IL 60606

Britt Marie Miller

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew David Provance

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 S. Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #3

Exhibit 3

13 #2

Exhibit 2

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

#4

#3

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION by Defendant Fair Isaac Corporation for extension of time Pending Resolution of Motions to Reassign (Joint) (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Fair Isaac Corporation (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fair Isaac Corporation by Matthew David Provance (Provance, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fair Isaac Corporation by J. Gregory Deis (Deis, J.) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fair Isaac Corporation by Britt Marie Miller (Miller, Britt) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union Notice of Filing of Motion for Reassignment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Slater, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16985881. (Halbert, Karen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16985859. (Roberts, Mike) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16970468. (Cohen, Bart) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16969989. (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union by Matthew T. Slater (Slater, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Slater, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union by Michael G Dickler (Dickler, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union by Joseph Michael Vanek (Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union by Paul Ethan Slater (Slater, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Slater, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16958430.(Slater, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Fair Isaac Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Slater

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Ethan Slater