This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2019 at 05:10:31 (UTC).

Alcide et al v. Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by Alcide against Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13691

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lehonard Bienaime

Meghan Hrncir

Rashad Woods

Carlos Clark

Richard Gant

Daniel Taylor

Erin LaMay

Sherria Hughley

Christopher Rivera

Terry Guidry

John Mead

Rod Felderman

Deonte Carter

Jhon Alcide

Marnitta George

Gaylord Lawrence

Megan Fitzpatrick

Jackson Schrimsher

LeeAnn Bienaime

Elizabeth Felderman

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Isenberg

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Notice to Visiting Attorneys

10 #3

Exhibit C: ECF Registration

10 #4

Proposed Order

10 #1

Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing

10 #2

Exhibit B: Affidavit

#10

(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Schoenbaum (Fee previously paid) by Jhon Alcide, Richard Allen-Easmon, Dustin Angle, Jesus Arguello, Valerie Arguello, Francis Asuncion, Marissa Asuncion, Sascha Belin, LeeAnn Bienaime, Lehonard Bienaime, Lakitra Burns-Jones, Deonte Carter, Carlos Clark, Ciera Clark, Elizabeth Felderman, Rod Felderman, Megan Fitzpatrick, Casey Frenzel, Richard Gant, Samantha Gant, Marnitta George, Rollin George, Lindsay Gonzalez, Raul Gonzalez, Rainford Graham, Terry Guidry, Meghan Hrncir, Sherria Hughley, Jermaine Jones, Ana Kenebrew, Freddie Kenebrew, Derrick Kennerly, Obra King, Anthonie LaMay, Erin LaMay, Gaylord Lawrence, Sydnee LeGrande, Tylor Locklear, Wilfred Marquis, Matthew Matczak, John Mead, Antoinette Morton, Antonio Morton, Christian Nash, Valeria Reinoso, Christopher Rivera, Tuyuan Rivera, Jackson Schrimsher, Michael Sheppard, Joshua Tapia, Daniel Taylor, Michael Watson, Samuel Williams, III, TyQuail Williams, Timothy Winters, Rashad Woods, Jacqueline Wrage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas J. Schoenbaum.. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on January 2, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha on 11/21/2019, answer due 2/19/2020. (Isenberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kasey K. Murray (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7984340) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: Attorney ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (clw). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

8 #1

Notice to Visiting Attorneys

4 #2

Exhibit B: Affidavit

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kasey Kendra Murray. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 21, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

4 #4

Proposed Order

4 #3

Exhibit C: Attorney ECF Registration

4 #1

Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M Schloss. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 21, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

3 #4

Proposed Order

3 #3

Exhibit C: Attorney ECF Registration

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas J. Schoenbaum.. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on January 2, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Schoenbaum (Fee previously paid) by Jhon Alcide, Richard Allen-Easmon, Dustin Angle, Jesus Arguello, Valerie Arguello, Francis Asuncion, Marissa Asuncion, Sascha Belin, LeeAnn Bienaime, Lehonard Bienaime, Lakitra Burns-Jones, Deonte Carter, Carlos Clark, Ciera Clark, Elizabeth Felderman, Rod Felderman, Megan Fitzpatrick, Casey Frenzel, Richard Gant, Samantha Gant, Marnitta George, Rollin George, Lindsay Gonzalez, Raul Gonzalez, Rainford Graham, Terry Guidry, Meghan Hrncir, Sherria Hughley, Jermaine Jones, Ana Kenebrew, Freddie Kenebrew, Derrick Kennerly, Obra King, Anthonie LaMay, Erin LaMay, Gaylord Lawrence, Sydnee LeGrande, Tylor Locklear, Wilfred Marquis, Matthew Matczak, John Mead, Antoinette Morton, Antonio Morton, Christian Nash, Valeria Reinoso, Christopher Rivera, Tuyuan Rivera, Jackson Schrimsher, Michael Sheppard, Joshua Tapia, Daniel Taylor, Michael Watson, Samuel Williams, III, TyQuail Williams, Timothy Winters, Rashad Woods, Jacqueline Wrage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha on 11/21/2019, answer due 2/19/2020. (Isenberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kasey Kendra Murray. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 21, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M Schloss. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 21, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/20/2019. (NEF: Section I, Mag. 3) (sa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Schoenbaum (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7984383) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: Attorney ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig) Modified on 11/20/2019 (clw). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kasey K. Murray (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7984340) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: Attorney ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (clw). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David M. Schloss (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-7984286) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C: Attorney ECF Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Craig) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (clw). (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nippon Yusen Kabushiki Kaisha (NYK Line) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7978504) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)Attorney Craig Isenberg added to All Plaintiffs.(Isenberg, Craig) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/19/2019) (clw). Modified texton 11/19/2019 (clw). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.